Barela et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Darla M. Barela and Gilbert C Barela, Jr
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02600
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333in
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. Per the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 12/10/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file a joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before 12/3/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/17/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs #8 Motion for Default Judgment and the record in this case. Defendant State Farms answer was one day late, and thus State Farm is technically in default. However, in the interest of justice, as well as this Courts strong preference to decide matters on their merits, the Court will ACCEPT State Farms untimely answer as filed, and thus DENIES Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/15/2019. Text Only Entry(wjmlc2)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Patrick C. Delaney by Patrick Christopher Delaney on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Patrick Christopher Delaney added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Delaney, Patrick)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Ross-Shannon, Bradley)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Attorney Bradley Ross-Shannon added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Ross-Shannon, Bradley)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Plaintiffs Darla M. Barela, Gilbert C Barela, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Supporting Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Affidavit Supporting Entry of Default, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Entry of Default)(Kiel, Joseph)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert C Barela, Jr, Darla M. Barela. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Kiel, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/18/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/12/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/16/2019. (jgonz, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/ 16/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/16/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6891380)Attorney Joseph W. Kiel added to party Darla M. Barela(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph W. Kiel added to party Gilbert C Barela, Jr(pty:pla), filed by Gilbert C Barela, Jr, Darla M. Barela. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kiel, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barela et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Delaney
Represented By: Bradley Ross-Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla M. Barela
Represented By: Joseph W. Kiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert C Barela, Jr
Represented By: Joseph W. Kiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?