iOmounts LLC v. Nite Ize, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: iOmounts LLC
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Nite Ize, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02603
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02603-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against iOmounts LLC by Nite Ize, Inc..(Parker, Kenneth)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Parker, Kenneth)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Parker, Kenneth)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff iOmounts LLC All parties do not consent.. (Holohan, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order in a Patent Case by Plaintiff iOmounts LLC. (Holohan, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/7/2019. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. answer due 11/7/2019; Nite Ize, Inc. answer due 11/7/2019; Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. answer due 11/7/2019.(tsher, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Nite Ize, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Parker, Kenneth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Kenneth G. Parker by Kenneth G. Parker on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Nite Ize, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Parker, Kenneth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jason T. Lao by Kenneth G. Parker on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Nite Ize, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Parker, Kenneth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Robert P. Ziemian by Kenneth G. Parker on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Nite Ize, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Parker, Kenneth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Justin Gilleland by Kenneth G. Parker on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Nite Ize, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.Attorney Kenneth G. Parker added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth G. Parker added to party Nite Ize, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth G. Parker added to party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft) (Parker, Kenneth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by iOmounts LLC. Nite Ize, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Holohan, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by iOmounts LLC. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Holohan, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by iOmounts LLC. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Holohan, Matthew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John C. Heuton on behalf of iOmounts LLCAttorney John C. Heuton added to party iOmounts LLC(pty:pla) (Heuton, John)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/16/2019 setting Scheduling Conference for 11/21/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Consent Form due by 11/7/2019. PLEASE READ ATTACHED PDF (jgonz, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Patent: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rvill, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Nite Ize, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff iOmounts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #2 Summons Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.)(Blakely, Todd)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Blakely, Todd)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Nite Ize, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6891759)Attorney Matthew Christian Holohan added to party iOmounts LLC(pty:pla), filed by iOmounts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holohan, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iOmounts LLC v. Nite Ize, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth G. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nite Ize, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth G. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth G. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iOmounts LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Holohan
Represented By: Todd P. Blakely
Represented By: John C. Heuton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?