State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Integra Dynamics, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Integra Dynamics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02618
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Greenberg, Alan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Buckner Hall, III on behalf of Integra Dynamics, Inc.Attorney Robert Buckner Hall, III added to party Integra Dynamics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hall, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Evans Harris on behalf of Integra Dynamics, Inc.Attorney Mark Evans Harris added to party Integra Dynamics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Harris, Mark)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/17/18 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/11/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/18/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attachment 2, #3 attachment 3) (nmarb, ) Modified on 9/17/2019 (nmarb, ).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/17/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Integra Dynamics, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6893447)Attorney Alan Greenberg added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:pla), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for issuance)(Greenberg, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Integra Dynamics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Alan Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Alan Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integra Dynamics, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Evans Harris
Represented By: Robert Buckner Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?