Verch v. KD Kanopy Inc.
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Defendant: KD Kanopy Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02624
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corrected STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant KD Kanopy Inc... (Getzoff, Timothy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant KD Kanopy Inc.. KD Kanopy Inc. answer due 11/15/2019. (Getzoff, Timothy)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/2/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), RICHARD LIEBOWITZ was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/17/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KD Kanopy Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6894453)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Marco Verch(pty:pla), filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verch v. KD Kanopy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KD Kanopy Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Paul Getzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?