Verch v. My Local Colorado Dental Practice LLC
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Defendant: My Local Colorado Dental Practice LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02625
Filed: September 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case and Settlement by Plaintiff Marco Verch (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), RICHARD LIEBOWITZ was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant My Local Colorado Dental Practice LLC's Answer is due 10/21/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/8/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Marco Verch. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 14, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, )
September 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against My Local Colorado Dental Practice LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6894514)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Marco Verch(pty:pla), filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verch v. My Local Colorado Dental Practice LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Local Colorado Dental Practice LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?