Paulson v. Two Rivers Water and Farming Company et al
Plaintiff: John Paulson
Defendant: Two Rivers Water and Farming Company, Timothy Beall, Wayne Harding and John R. McKowen
Case Number: 1:2019cv02639
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/14/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 25 Defendants Two Rivers Water and Farming Company and Wayne Harding's ANSWER to #4 Complaint from Plaintiff John Paulson by Wayne Harding, Two Rivers Water and Farming Company.(Hilbert, Otto)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/12/2019. Pending before this court is Defendants Two Rivers Water and Farming Company and Wayne Harding's #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, wherein they request a seven-day extension of time to answer or respond to the Complaint by November 6, 2019. The requested deadline has since expired with no answer or response being filed. Accordingly, this court DENIES as moot #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond and DIRECTS Defendants Two Rivers Water and Farming Company and Wayne Harding to file their Answer or Response to the Complaint no later than close of business (i.e., 5:00 p.m.) tomorrow, November 13, 2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Two Rivers Water and Farming Company, Wayne Harding. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/12/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/12/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Wayne Harding, Two Rivers Water and Farming Company. (Hilbert, Otto)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/15/2019. In light of 16 Case Reassigned, the Status Conference set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is VACATED. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan L. Rosca on behalf of John PaulsonAttorney Alan L. Rosca added to party John Paulson(pty:pla) (Rosca, Alan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christian A. Pfeiffer on behalf of John PaulsonAttorney Christian A. Pfeiffer added to party John Paulson(pty:pla) (Pfeiffer, Christian)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul J. Scarlato on behalf of John PaulsonAttorney Paul J. Scarlato added to party John Paulson(pty:pla) (Scarlato, Paul)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02639-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Affidavits of Service in Underlying Denver District Court Action that has Been Removed to this Court by Plaintiff John Paulson (Miller, Steve)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff John Paulson All parties do not consent.. (Miller, Steve)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Dean Neville on behalf of John R. McKowenAttorney Thomas Dean Neville added to party John R. McKowen(pty:dft) (Neville, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/26/2019. Plaintiff's counsel may appear telephonically for the Status Conference set for 10/21/2019 by contacting chambers jointly, on one telephone line at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. Furthermore, counsel are reminded of their obligations to confer with opposing counsel pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a), as future noncompliance may result in this court striking the motion without substantive consideration. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff John Paulson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Miller, Steve)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/24/19. Consent Form due by 10/7/2019. Status Conference set for 10/21/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Edward Fogg on behalf of John R. McKowenAttorney James Edward Fogg added to party John R. McKowen(pty:dft) (Fogg, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steve A. Miller on behalf of John PaulsonAttorney Steve A. Miller added to party John Paulson(pty:pla) (Miller, Steve)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan Hardie Jacks on behalf of John R. McKowenAttorney Susan Hardie Jacks added to party John R. McKowen(pty:dft) (Jacks, Susan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Timothy Beall, Wayne Harding, John R. McKowen, Two Rivers Water and Farming Company, filed by John Paulson.(rvill, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by John R. McKowen.(Mihm, Michael) Modified to correct text entry on 9/17/2019 (rvill, ).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John R. McKowen from District Court, City and County of Denver, Case Number 2019cv33099. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6896304), filed by John R. McKowen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pre Trial Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Order re: Discovery Protocol, #4 Exhibit 4 - Delay Reduction Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mihm, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulson v. Two Rivers Water and Farming Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Rivers Water and Farming Company
Represented By: Otto K. Hilbert, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Harding
Represented By: Otto K. Hilbert, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. McKowen
Represented By: Michael T. Mihm
Represented By: Thomas Dean Neville
Represented By: James Edward Fogg
Represented By: Susan Hardie Jacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paulson
Represented By: Christian A. Pfeiffer
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Paul J. Scarlato
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?