Head v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. Benjamin Head
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02650
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A-501. (amont, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Margaret Parnell Hogan on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc.Attorney Margaret Parnell Hogan added to party Frontier Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hogan, Margaret)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Benjamin Head. (Roseman, Barry)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #10 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/25/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Benjamin Head All parties consent.. (Roseman, Barry)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Ashley Webber on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc.Attorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party Frontier Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft) (Webber, Erin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen E. Baumann, II on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc.Attorney Stephen E. Baumann, II added to party Frontier Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft) (Baumann, Stephen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Benjamin Head. Frontier Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 9/18/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Roseman, Barry)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/20/2019. Consent Form due by 10/28/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 01:45 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02650-MEH. (athom, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6897720)Attorney Barry Douglas Roseman added to party Benjamin Head(pty:pla), filed by Benjamin Head. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Roseman, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Benjamin Head
Represented By: Barry Douglas Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?