Martinez v. Circle K Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roshann Martinez
Defendant: Circle K Stores, Inc., Valejo Diamond Metro Inc., CST Metro, Circle K Stores, Valero Marketing and Supply Company and Valero Oil
Case Number: 1:2019cv02656
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #17 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/15/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John B. Dougherty on behalf of Roshann MartinezAttorney John B. Dougherty added to party Roshann Martinez(pty:pla) (Dougherty, John)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: The parties have consented to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in this matter, but Plaintiff's counsel must enter an appearance before this matter can be directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Crews. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Counsel shall file his or her Entry of Appearance, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a), by no later than 11/13/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/12/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/12/19. (amont, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 11/12/2019. Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2020. Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2020. Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/31/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. A four (4) day Jury Trial is set to commence on 10/13/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Circle K Stores, Inc. All parties consent.. (Johnson, James)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: The Parties' Proposed Scheduling Order [#15 ] indicates that they have consented to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in this matter, but they have not filed their Magistrate Judge Consent Form. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#13 ] by 12:00 PM on 11/11/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/8/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Circle K Stores, Inc.. (Johnson, James)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 11/5/2019. Consent Form due by 11/5/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/19/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT ORDER re: Joint Motion to Dismiss, signed by a Adams County District Court Judge on 12 September, 2019. (cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Circle K Stores, Inc., Valejo Diamond Metro Inc., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Oil, filed by Roshann Martinez.(cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Valero Diamond Metro on 28 August, 2019 (cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Valero Oil on 28 August, 2019 (cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Circle K Stores on 20 August, 2019 (cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Circle K Stores, Inc., Valejo Diamond Metro Inc., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Oil, filed by Roshann Martinez.(cmadr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tanya Ann Sevy on behalf of Circle K Stores, Inc.Attorney Tanya Ann Sevy added to party Circle K Stores, Inc.(pty:dft) (Sevy, Tanya)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Circle K Stores, Inc..(Johnson, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc. for Circle K Stores, Inc.. (Johnson, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Circle K Stores, Inc. from Adams County District Court, Case Number 2019cv30935. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6899030), filed by Circle K Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Johnson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Circle K Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roshann Martinez
Represented By: John B. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Tanya Ann Sevy
Represented By: James Ryan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valejo Diamond Metro Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CST Metro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores
Represented By: Tanya Ann Sevy
Represented By: James Ryan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?