Williams v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Williams
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., d/b/a Wal-Mart, d/b/a Wal-Mart Supercenter #842 and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02663
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/13/2019. (ksena)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 11/13/2019, ( Discovery due by 7/31/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2020.). FTR: COURTROOM 101. (ksena)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/06/2019. (athom, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. All parties consent.. (Larson, Ashley)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Larson, Ashley)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ross Stephen Iakovakis on behalf of Timothy WilliamsAttorney Ross Stephen Iakovakis added to party Timothy Williams(pty:pla) (Iakovakis, Ross)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/26/2019. (ksena)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Larson, Ashley)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/23/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, by Judge Jill Mattoon, Pueblo County District Court, on September 11, 2019. (rsams, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. on August 19, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Timothy Williams. (rsams, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Timothy Williams.(rsams, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Larson, Ashley)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., d/b/a Wal-Mart, d/b/a Wal-Mart Supercenter #842 from Pueblo County District Court, Case Number 2019cv030443. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6901066), filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., d/b/a Wal-Mart, d/b/a Wal-Mart Supercenter #842. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Larson, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Williams
Represented By: Ross Stephen Iakovakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., d/b/a Wal-Mart, d/b/a Wal-Mart Supercenter #842
Represented By: Ashley Ricketson Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ricketson Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?