Dismuke v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dismuke
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02689
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Northern District of California pursuant to the Certified Copy of the Conditional Transfer Order. ecfhelpdesk@cand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-158) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 19-cv-02689 SKC, to The Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2741, by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (evana, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 11/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 11/12/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3-1) is due 11/12/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/3/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Dismuke. Monsanto Company served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Parker, Jerrold)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-50, Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6903434)Attorney Jerrold Seth Parker added to party Jonathan Dismuke(pty:pla), filed by Jonathan Dismuke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Parker, Jerrold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dismuke v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dismuke
Represented By: Jerrold Seth Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?