Starski v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Esq. Edward Starski and Edward Starski
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02693
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: Because Plaintiff has failed to participate in the preparation of the proposed scheduling order, the Scheduling Conference set for November 5, 2019, is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/1/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Graham, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Two-Day Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties shall file their proposed Scheduling Order no later than October 31, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/30/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/30/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Graham, Daniel)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/21/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Graham, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/5/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/26/2019. (ksena)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc... (Graham, Daniel)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/ 24/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/24/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1082-6904316 (cmadr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Verified COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed by Edward Starski.(cmadr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Graham, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Albert Nicholas Graham on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc.Attorney Daniel Albert Nicholas Graham added to party Caliber Home Loans, Inc.(pty:dft) (Graham, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Order re Payment of Filing Fees, #4 State Court Delay Prevention Order, #5 State Court Summons, #6 State Court Docket, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Court Civil Cover Sheet)(Graham, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starski v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Albert Nicholas Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esq. Edward Starski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Starski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?