Williams et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Plaintiff: Infinity Restoration, Aaron T Williams and Karena A Williams
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02694
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #22 Notice (Other) filed by attorney Derek Lee Fadner. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct - attorney contact information is missing. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). Text Only Entry) (athom, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant by Plaintiffs Aaron T Williams, Karena A Williams (Fadner, Derek)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Johnson, Katie)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/6/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02694-REB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. All parties do not consent.. (Johnson, Katie)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiffs Aaron T Williams, Karena A Williams (Fadner, Derek)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Johnson, Katie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), DEREK LEE FADNER was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., filed by Aaron T Williams, Karena A Williams.(Fadner, Derek)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Derek Lee Fadner on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Derek Lee Fadner added to party Aaron T Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Derek Lee Fadner added to party Karena A Williams(pty:pla) (Fadner, Derek)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/26/2019. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. answer due 10/4/2019. (tsher, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Johnson, Katie)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #9 Order to Chris C.R. Sidebottom, The Law Office of Christopher Sidebottom, 301 Newark St., Aurora CO 80010. Text Only Entry (tsher, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/23/2019. Consent Form due by 11/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER re: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Arapahoe County District Court Judge Elizabeth Ann Weishaupl on September 11, 2019. (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. on 08/21/2019. (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., filed by Aaron T Williams, Infinity Restoration, Karena A Williams.(rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Johnson, Katie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV31451. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6904492), filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Katie Berit Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infinity Restoration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron T Williams
Represented By: Derek Lee Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karena A Williams
Represented By: Derek Lee Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?