Kumar et al v. Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Pallavi Kumar and Mithilesh Kumar
Defendant: Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv02696
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Mithilesh Kumar, Pallavi Kumar. (Fadner, Derek)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on November 7, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #20 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02696-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Bacanskas, Eve)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiffs Mithilesh Kumar, Pallavi Kumar (Fadner, Derek)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Derek Lee Fadner on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Derek Lee Fadner added to party Mithilesh Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Derek Lee Fadner added to party Pallavi Kumar(pty:pla) (Fadner, Derek)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America.(Werner, Katelyn)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America. (Werner, Katelyn)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #14 Order to Christopher C.R. Sidebottom at 301 Newark Street, Aurora, CO 80010. Text Only Entry (tsher, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/25/2019. Consent Form due by 11/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2696-NRN (angar, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extenstion [sic] of Time. Signed by Arapahoe County District Court Judge Jon Wheeler on September 11, 2019. (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America on 08/21/2019. (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, filed by Mithilesh Kumar, Pallavi Kumar.(rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, filed by Mithilesh Kumar, Pallavi Kumar.(rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eve Bacanskas on behalf of Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Eve Bacanskas added to party Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Bacanskas, Eve)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katelyn Shea Werner on behalf of Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Katelyn Shea Werner added to party Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Werner, Katelyn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America. (Palmeri, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV31454. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6904895), filed by Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmeri, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumar et al v. Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pallavi Kumar
Represented By: Derek Lee Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mithilesh Kumar
Represented By: Derek Lee Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Katelyn Shea Werner
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Eve Bacanskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?