Farooqui v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Aziz Farooqui
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, d/b/a U.S. Bank, U.S. Bank National Association and U.S. Bank National Association doing business as U.S. Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv02728
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. (Kratz, Timothy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Bank National Association.(Kratz, Timothy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. U.S. Bank National Association answer due 11/6/2019. (Kratz, Timothy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Michael Kratz on behalf of U.S. Bank National AssociationAttorney Timothy Michael Kratz added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft) (Kratz, Timothy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey H. McClelland on behalf of U.S. Bank National AssociationAttorney Jeffrey H. McClelland added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft) (McClelland, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aziz Farooqui. U.S. Bank National Association served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Schreiber, Sarah)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Claire E. Hunter by Claire E. Hunter on behalf of Aziz FarooquiAttorney Claire E. Hunter added to party Aziz Farooqui(pty:pla) (Hunter, Claire)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/25/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/2/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/25/2019. (jgonz, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against U.S. Bank National Association, d/b/a U.S. Bank (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6910893)Attorney Sarah Alice Schreiber added to party Aziz Farooqui(pty:pla), filed by Aziz Farooqui. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Schreiber, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farooqui v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, d/b/a U.S. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Jeffrey H. McClelland
Represented By: Timothy Michael Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association doing business as U.S. Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey H. McClelland
Represented By: Timothy Michael Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz Farooqui
Represented By: Sarah Alice Schreiber
Represented By: Claire E. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?