Securities and Exchange Commission v. MR Cattle Production Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission and Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: MR Cattle Production Services, LLC, Reva Stachniw, Sunshine Enterprises, Ronald Throgmartin, Mark David Ray, Universal Herbs, LLC, RM Farm and Livestock, LLC, Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC, DBC Limited, LLC and Mark Ray
Receiver: Gary Schwartz
Case Number: 1:2019cv02789
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 10
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 58 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF DEFENDANTS ASSETS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roush, Katherine)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF DEFENDANTS ASSETS. For good cause shown, the parties are GRANTED an extension of time to and including 11/12/2021 to file their next Status Report. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 11/5/2021. Text Only Entry(rmrja)
November 4, 2021 Filing 56 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF DEFENDANTS ASSETS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Roush, Katherine)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to FILE STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF DEFENDANTS ASSETS. For good cause shown, the parties are granted an extension of two weeks, to and including 11/5/2021, to file their next Status Report. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 10/22/2021. Text Only Entry(rmrja)
October 22, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF DEFENDANTS ASSETS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Roush, Katherine)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #52 entry of appearance of Mr. M. Graham Loomis on behalf of the Securities and Exchange Commission, the #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. Attorney Joshua A. Mayes is terminated from his representation of the Commission in this matter. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/17/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by M. Graham Loomis on behalf of Securities and Exchange CommissionAttorney M. Graham Loomis added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Loomis, M.)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the court on the #49 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel, which this court construes as a motion to withdraw as counsel. See D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(b) ("An attorney who has filed an Entry of Appearance... in a case may seek to withdraw on motion showing good cause. Withdrawal shall be effective only on court order entered after service of the motion to withdraw on all counsel of record, any unrepresented party, and the client of the withdrawing attorney." (emphases added)). The Motion was referred to the undersigned pursuant to the 50 Memorandum dated September 16, 2021. The Motion states that Attorney Joshua A. Mayes seeks to withdraw from his representation of the Securities and Exchange Commission (the "Commission") in this matter, but that "Mr. Loomis will continue to represent the Commission in this action." Doc. No. #49 at 1. However, Mr. Mayes is the only current counsel of record for the Commission. The Motion cannot be granted unless and until another attorney enters his or her appearance on behalf of the Commission, so as to ensure continuing representation of the Commission. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/16/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM regarding #49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 9/16/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
September 15, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of withdrawal of counsel by client consent by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Mayes, Joshua) Modified on 9/16/2021 to correct event type. (alave, ).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 This action is reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez upon her appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Rodriguez in Courtroom A-702. Her chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. Her telephone number is 303-335-2170. All future pleadings 19-cv-02789-RMR. Text only entry. (agarc, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #12 Order CONSENT BIFURCATED JUDGMENT by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Exhibit Comparison of Original and Proposed Amended Order)(Roush, Katherine)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re: #45 Status Report filed by Gary Schwartz. The administrative stay will remain lifted for the limited purpose of permitting the Receiver to issue federal subpoenas pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. (See Doc. 22.) The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report after issuance of the subpoenas or by August 19, 2021, whichever is sooner, advising the court as to the status of the subpoenas. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/21/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 45 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF DEFENDANTS ASSETS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roush, Katherine)
May 3, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine Anna Roush on behalf of Gary Schwartz (Roush, Katherine)
April 28, 2021 Filing 43 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Katherine Anna Roush under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (tnguy)
April 24, 2021 Filing 42 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2021 pursuant to 41 Order. Text Only Entry (athom, )
April 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 7, 2021 that incorporates the forthcoming report in the state receivership action. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/24/2021. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF DEFENDANTS ASSETS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Roush, Katherine)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re: #38 Status Report filed by Gary Schwartz. The administrative stay will remain lifted for the limited purpose of permitting the Receiver to issue federal subpoenas pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. (See Doc. 22.) The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report after issuance of the subpoenas or by June 9, 2021, whichever is sooner, advising the court as to the status of the subpoenas. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/9/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 38 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING ISSUING SUBPOENAS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Roush, Katherine)
December 3, 2020 Filing 37 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/3/2021 pursuant to 36 Minute Order. Text Only Entry (athom, )
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER re: #35 Status Report filed by Gary Schwartz. The administrative stay will remain lifted for the limited purpose of permitting the Receiver to issue federal subpoenas pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. (See Doc. 22.) The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report after issuance of the subpoenas or by March 3, 2021, whichever is sooner, advising the court as to the status of the subpoenas. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/3/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) Modified on 12/3/2020 to correct status report due date (athom, ).
December 2, 2020 Filing 35 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING ISSUING SUBPOENAS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Roush, Katherine)
October 23, 2020 Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF DEFENDANTS ASSETS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chanin, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 33 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2020 pursuant to 32 Minute Order. Text Only Entry (athom, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: The administrative stay will remain lifted for the limited purpose of permitting the Receiver to issue federal subpoenas pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. (See Doc. 22.) The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report after issuance of the subpoenas or by 12/2/2020, whichever is sooner, advising the Court as to the status of the subpoenas. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/3/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 31 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING ISSUING SUBPOENAS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Roush, Katherine)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: MINUTE ORDER: The administrative stay will remain lifted for the limited purpose of permitting the Receiver to issue federal subpoenas pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. (See Doc. 22.) The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report after issuance of the subpoenas or by 9/2/2020, whichever is sooner, advising the Court as to the status of the subpoenas. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/2/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING ISSUING SUBPOENAS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Roush, Katherine)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: The administrative stay will remain lifted for the limited purpose of permitting the Receiver to issue federalsubpoenas pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. (See Doc. 22.) The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report after issuance of the subpoenas or by 6/2/2020, whichever is sooner, advising the Court as to the status of the subpoenas. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/2/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 27 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING ISSUING SUBPOENAS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Roush, Katherine)
March 12, 2020 Filing 26 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/12/2020. ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Attorney Daniel W. Carr and John Alonzo Hutchings terminated. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (slibi, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER re: #23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/9/2020. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/12/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Counsel shall initiate a conference call among themselves prior to calling chambers at 303.335.2600 on one telephone line at the designated time. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by MR Cattle Production Services, LLC, Universal Herbs, LLC, Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC, DBC Limited, LLC, Mark Ray. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/6/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Defendants Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC, DBC Limited, LLC, MR Cattle Production Services, LLC, Mark Ray, Universal Herbs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Client, #2 Exhibit Notification Certificate, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record)(Hutchings, John)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Lift Stay. The administrative stay of this case is temporarily lifted for the sole purpose of the issuance of subpoenas. (See Doc. 19.) The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report after issuance of the subpoenas or within thirty days, whichever is sooner, advising the Court as to the status of the subpoenas. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/3/2020. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re: #19 Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF ISSUING SUBPOENAS filed by Gary Schwartz. Motion No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 03/03/2020. Text Only Entry (athom, )
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #19 Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF ISSUING SUBPOENAS filed by Gary Schwartz. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/5/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF ISSUING SUBPOENAS by Receiver Gary Schwartz. (Chanin, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine Anna Roush on behalf of Gary SchwartzAttorney Katherine Anna Roush added to party Gary Schwartz(pty:rc) (Roush, Katherine)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Andrew Chanin on behalf of Gary SchwartzAttorney John Andrew Chanin added to party Gary Schwartz(pty:rc) (Chanin, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT BIFURCATED JUDGMENT entered by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/18/2019. (lrobe)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Entry of Consent Order. This case is administratively stayed as ordered. Joint status reports due every six months, beginning 4/20/2020. Entered by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/18/2019.(lrobe)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Judgment by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Consent of Settling Defendants, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Mayes, Joshua)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Court Orders Staying Litigation by Defendants Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC, DBC Limited, LLC, MR Cattle Production Services, LLC, Mark Ray, Universal Herbs, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hutchings, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Consent Bifurcated Judgment by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/10/19. (sgrim)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Consent Bifurcated Judgment by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/10/19. (sgrim)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The stipulated motion #3 for judgment as to Mark Ray, Universal Herbs,LLC, Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC, MR Cattle Production Services,LLC, DBC Limited, LLC, and Ron Throgmartin is GRANTED. Consent bifurcatedjudgments are being filed herewith, by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/10/19.(sgrim)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/1/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #4 and #5 Notice of Entry of Appearance,, filed by attorneys Daniel W. Carr & John Alonzo Hutchings. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix a complete signature block to all future pleadings.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel W. Carr on behalf of Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC, DBC Limited, LLC, MR Cattle Production Services, LLC, Mark David Ray, Universal Herbs, LLCAttorney Daniel W. Carr added to party Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel W. Carr added to party DBC Limited, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel W. Carr added to party MR Cattle Production Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel W. Carr added to party Mark David Ray(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel W. Carr added to party Universal Herbs, LLC(pty:dft) (Carr, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Alonzo Hutchings on behalf of Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC, DBC Limited, LLC, MR Cattle Production Services, LLC, Mark David Ray, Universal Herbs, LLCAttorney John Alonzo Hutchings added to party Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Alonzo Hutchings added to party DBC Limited, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Alonzo Hutchings added to party MR Cattle Production Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Alonzo Hutchings added to party Mark David Ray(pty:dft), Attorney John Alonzo Hutchings added to party Universal Herbs, LLC(pty:dft) (Hutchings, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Stipulated MOTION for Judgment as to Mark Ray, Universal Herbs, Custom Consulting, MR Cattle, DBC Limited and Ron Throgmartin by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Bifurcated Judgment as to Mark Ray, Universal Herbs, Custom Consulting, MR Cattle and DBC Limited, #3 Affidavit Consent of Ray, Custom Consulting, MR Cattle, Universal Herbs and DBC Limited, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Bifurcated Judgment as to Ron Throgmartin, #5 Affidavit Consent of Ron Throgmartin)(Mayes, Joshua)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Mark Ray, Reva Stachniw, Ron Throgmartin, Universal Herbs, MR Cattle Production, RM Farm & Livestock, DBC Limited, Sunshine Enterprises by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons DBC Limited, #2 Summons MR Cattle, #3 Summons Reva Stachniw, #4 Summons Sunshine Enterprises, #5 Summons Universal Herbs, #6 Summons Custom Consulting, #7 Summons RM Farm & Livestock, #8 Summons Ron Throgmartin, #9 Summons Mark Ray)(Mayes, Joshua)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Joshua A. Mayes added to party Securities & Exchange Commission(pty:pla), filed by Securities & Exchange Commission.(Mayes, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. MR Cattle Production Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR Cattle Production Services, LLC
Represented By: John Alonzo Hutchings
Represented By: Daniel W. Carr
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reva Stachniw
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Enterprises
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Throgmartin
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark David Ray
Represented By: John Alonzo Hutchings
Represented By: Daniel W. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Herbs, LLC
Represented By: John Alonzo Hutchings
Represented By: Daniel W. Carr
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RM Farm and Livestock, LLC
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Consulting & Product Services, LLC
Represented By: John Alonzo Hutchings
Represented By: Daniel W. Carr
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBC Limited, LLC
Represented By: John Alonzo Hutchings
Represented By: Daniel W. Carr
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ray
Represented By: John Alonzo Hutchings
Represented By: Daniel W. Carr
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Joshua A. Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Joshua A. Mayes
Represented By: M. Graham Loomis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Gary Schwartz
Represented By: John Andrew Chanin
Represented By: Katherine Anna Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?