Soto v. Dillon Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: Adriana Soto
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02812
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/7/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/22/2019. (jgonz, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/22/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2812-LTB-STV (angar, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicole Caroline Daniels on behalf of Adriana SotoAttorney Nicole Caroline Daniels added to party Adriana Soto(pty:pla) (Daniels, Nicole)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (agarc, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER, Defenses, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand of Defendant Dillon Companies, LLC to #7 Complaint by Dillon Companies, LLC.(agarc, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Dillon Companies, LLC, filed by Adriana Soto.(agarc, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McClung, Larry)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carl Francis McEncroe on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLCAttorney Carl Francis McEncroe added to party Dillon Companies, LLC(pty:dft) (McEncroe, Carl)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLCAttorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Dillon Companies, LLC(pty:dft) (Pratt, Katherine)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dillon Companies, LLC from Denver County District Court, Case Number 19CV33299. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6925146), filed by Dillon Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- Complaint and District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit B - Summons and Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit C - Dillon Companies Cert of Good Standing & Periodic Report, #6 Exhibit D - Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit E - Kroger Co. Cert of Good Standing & Periodic Report, #8 Exhibit F - State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit G - Defendant's Answer, #10 Exhibit H - Notice to Elect Exclusion from CRCP 16.1, #11 Exhibit I - Pre-Trial Order, #12 Exhibit J - Delay Reduction Order, #13 Exhibit K - Notice to Set 3-Day Jury Trial and CMC, #14 Exhibit L - Amended Notice to Set 3-Day Jury Trial and CMC)(McClung, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Dillon Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Soto
Represented By: Nicole Caroline Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC
Represented By: Carl Francis McEncroe
Represented By: Larry S. McClung
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?