Hurd v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Susanne R. Hurd
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv02825
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #64 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/25/2019. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM regarding #64 MOTION for Order to filed by Susanne R. Hurd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/21/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (angar, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 63 COURTROOM MINUTES for Telephonic Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/7/2019. Granting in part #59 Defendants' Motion for Order that Proper Service be Completed by November 13, 2019. Plaintiff is ordered to effectuate appropriate service by 11/15/2019. Scheduling Conference reset for 12/16/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (ebuch)
November 4, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE to #59 MOTION for Order to Complete Proper Service by November 13, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (angar, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/31/2019 re: #59 MOTION for Order to Complete Proper Service by November 13, 2019 filed by Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM regarding #59 MOTION for Order to Complete Proper Service by November 13, 2019 filed by Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/30/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Order to Complete Proper Service by November 13, 2019 by Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McNabb, Laura)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10 /11/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/11/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 56 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #55 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02825-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 55 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service All parties do not consent.. (McNabb, Laura)
October 7, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Laura J. McNabb on behalf of Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal ServiceAttorney Laura J. McNabb added to party Megan J. Brennan(pty:dft), Attorney Laura J. McNabb added to party United States Postal Service(pty:dft) (McNabb, Laura)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/3/2019. Consent Form due by 11/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 49 Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:19-cv-00082. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
October 2, 2019 Filing 52 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 51 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 50 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 12, 2019 Case transferred to USDC-District of Colorado. Original electronic file sent. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations, ECF No. #42 , are adopted in their entirety. Defendant's Motion to Transfer, ECF No. #19 , is granted. Plaintiff's Objections to the Findings and Recommendations, ECF Nos. #43 and #45 , are overruled. This action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER denying #46 Motion. Plaintiff's motion is denied without prejudice to reassertion following a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION join 8:19- 0209 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 45 OBJECTION to Findings and Recommendation,, #42 , Findings and Recommendation, #17 answer to #44 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 44 BRIEF in support of FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that MOTION to Transfer #19 to #42 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
July 6, 2019 Filing 43 OBJECTION to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. #42 ) on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct event per Chambers (KLF). [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to Senior United States District Court Judge Laurie Smith Camp that Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Filing No. #19 ) be granted and that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. A party may object to a magistrate judge's order by filing an objection within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of the findings and recommendation. Failure to timely object may constitute a waiver of any objection. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER denying #40 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. It is unclear what relief Plaintiff seeks. Therefore, her motion is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 22, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION notify the U.S. Attorney General on FCR question on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER denying #38 Motion. While not entirely clear, it appears that Plaintiff is requesting that an action pending before the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission be joined with this suit. This request is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 38 JOINT MOTION Join the Phoenix EEOC case to this case regarding MOTION to Transfer #19 , Brief #22 , Index #20 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation, ECF No. #17 , are adopted in their entirety. Plaintiffs Notice of Remand, ECF No. #7 , and Motion of Remand, ECF No. #9 , are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER denying #34 Motion to Lift Stay. Plaintiff has not presented a sufficient basis for lifting the stay in this case. Therefore, Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER denying #33 Motion to Lift Stay. Plaintiff has not presented a sufficient basis for lifting the stay in this case. Therefore, Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 2, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION motion for Stay to be lifted on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
June 2, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Lift motion of Stay on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion to Transfer #19 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) Modified on 6/3/2019 (LRH). Modified on 6/3/2019 (LRH). [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER denying #30 Motion. Plaintiff may reassert her request after the Court rules on Defendants' Motion to Transfer #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Remark - Public: An alias of Susanne Becker was added to Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd because Susanne Hurd registered for electronic filing under the name of Susanne Becker. (JLS) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION To bring the Defendents in the 8:19cv209 case together into one case for the issues involved are similar on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Remark - Public: CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Susanne Hurd (Susanne Becker) received on 5/31/19 and access granted on 5/31/19. (JLS) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER denying #27 Motion to Lift Stay. Plaintiff has not presented a sufficient basis for lifting the stay in this case. Therefore, Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER denying #26 Motion for Joinder. Plaintiff's motion is denied without prejudice to reassertion following a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Relief of Lifted Stay on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION of Joinder on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER denying #23 Plaintiff's Motion for Joinder. Plaintiff's motion is denied without prejudice to reassertion following a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion to Stay. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer #19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Joiner on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Stay Proceedings #21 , MOTION to Transfer #19 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 20 INDEX in support of MOTION to Transfer #19 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shareen K. Wertz)(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER denying #16 Motion. Plaintiff has requested that the Court not give Defendants additional time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Because Defendants do not have a motion for extension of time pending, Plaintiff's request is denied as premature. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION - to Senior United States District Court Judge Laurie Smith Camp that Plaintiff's Notice of Remand (Filing No. #7 ) and Motion to Remand (Filing No. #9 ) be denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION FOR ESTOPPEL BY LACHES on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Third Extension) by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE of motion of Dismissal on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Second) by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Remand #7 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction and Proof and Service on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION (Notice) to Remand on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R Hurd. (KLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. United States Postal Service shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Susanne R Hurd from District Court of Scotts Bluff County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-777 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Megan J. Brennan, United States Postal Service (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Memorandum and Order)(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurd v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne R. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?