Othen et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Leanne Othen and Jason Grant
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02841
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/21/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/1/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set December 4, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/19. (rbjsec. )
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2841-RBJ (angar, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02841-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/29/19 re: #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Jason Grant, Leanne Othen. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Jason Grant, Leanne Othen All parties do not consent.. (Vicary, Drew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(Gerk, Tyler)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. American Strategic Insurance Corp. answer due 10/18/2019, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/11/2019.(jgonz, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gerk, Tyler)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Drew W. Vicary on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Drew W. Vicary added to party Jason Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Drew W. Vicary added to party Leanne Othen(pty:pla) (Vicary, Drew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan Paige Singleton on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Susan Paige Singleton added to party Jason Grant(pty:pla), Attorney Susan Paige Singleton added to party Leanne Othen(pty:pla) (Singleton, Susan)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/19, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/27/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#7] is November 20, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Sean Smith on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Daniel Sean Smith added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Smith, Daniel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon American Strategic Insurance Corp. on 16 September, 2019 (cmadr, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed by Leanne Othen, Jason Grant.(cmadr, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by attorneyTyler David Gerk.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature replete with the full signature block information.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corp. from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2019cv3844. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6929760), filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gerk, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Othen et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Tyler David Gerk
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne Othen
Represented By: Drew W. Vicary
Represented By: Susan Paige Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Grant
Represented By: Drew W. Vicary
Represented By: Susan Paige Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?