Friends of Animals v. Perdue et al
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: United States Forest Service and George Ervin Perdue, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv02925
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. George Ervin Perdue, III answer due 1/20/2019; United States Forest Service answer due 1/20/2019, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/12/2019.(jgonz, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants George Ervin Perdue, III, United States Forest Service. (Ross, Katherine)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants United States Forest Service, George Ervin Perdue, III. United States Forest Service answer due 12/12/2019; George Ervin Perdue, III answer due 12/12/2019. (Ross, Katherine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Forest Service served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Best, Jennifer)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) George Ervin Perdue, III served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Best, Jennifer)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/19 Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference. Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (nmarb, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6945454)Attorney Jennifer E. Best added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Summons Barr, #2 Summons Dunn, #3 Summons Perdue, #4 Summons Forest Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Best, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. Perdue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Ervin Perdue, III
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Jennifer E. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?