USA v. 10413 County Road 76 1/2, Windsor, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $14,064.34 Seized From Wells Fargo Account 9048072798, $18,746.00 in United States Currency, 25 Pamp Suisse Gold Bars 1 Gram Each, Canadian Cougar Coin 1 Ounce, Sunshine Mint Gold Bar 5 Grams, 2015 Toyota Tundra Crewmax SR5, VIN: 5tfdw5f13fx447662, 123 Miscellaneous Firearms Parts and Ammunition, 2015 Toyota Tundra Crewmax Limited, VIN: 5tfhw5f14fx430497, Four Horsemen of The Apocalypse Silver Set, $65,034.16 Seized From First Bank Account 8145510716, Tyrannosaurus Rex Silver Coin, Provident Silver Bar 10 Ounces, 500 West Point Silver Coins, 1908 United States 2 1/2 Dollar Coin, Gairsoppa Shipwreck Silver Bar 10 Ounces, 5 MX Dos Pesos Coins, Noahs Ark Silver Coin 10 Ounces, $16,887.75 Seized From First Bank Account 8142726343, Canadian Maple Leaf Gold Coin 1/10 Ounce, 43 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 5 Ounces Each, 2 2015 United States Gold Coins 1 Ounce Each, 10 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 1 Ounce Each, 10 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 10 Ounces Each, Pamp Suisse Gold Bar 2.5 Grams, Canadian Maple Leaf Coin 1 Ounce, $724.00 in United States Currency, 500 2015 ASE Silver Coins, 500 Canadian Maple Silver Coins 1 Ounce Each, 500 2015 and 2014 Silver Coins, Morgan Silver Bar 10 Ounces, Sunshine Mint Silver Bar 100 Ounces, 2 Generic Silver Coins With Buffalo 1 Ounce Each, 2 Collector Coins (1 Gairsoppa, 1 Al Capone), 10413 County Road 76 1/2, Windsor, Colorado, 15 Gold Bars 1 Ounce Each, 1883 Morgan Silver Dollar, 25 2015 Canadian Maple Mint Coins 1 Ounce Each, 7 Generic Silver Coins 1 Ounce Each and Jenna E Stroh
Claimant: Michael John Suppes
Case Number: 1:2019cv02953
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1957
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/2/19 GRANTING #10 Claimant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings, pending the outcome of Mr. Suppes' related criminal case. Ordered that the Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/20 is VACATED. (nmarb, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Claimant Michael John Suppes. (Polansky, Lisa)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/27/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/11/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 2/18/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Defendant Jenna E Stroh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leedy, Brian)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Rowland Leedy on behalf of Jenna E StrohAttorney Brian Rowland Leedy added to party Jenna E Stroh(pty:dft) (Leedy, Brian)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM by Claimant Michael John Suppes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment A)(Polansky, Lisa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 10413 County Road 76, Windsor, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $14,064.34 Seized From Wells Fargo Account 9048072798, $16,887.75 Seized From First Bank Account 8142726343, $18,746.00 in United States Currency, $65,034.16 Seized From First Bank Account 8145510716, $724.00 in United States Currency, 10 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 1 Ounce Each, 10 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 10 Ounces Each, 10413 County Road 76 1/2, Windsor, Colorado, 123 Miscellaneous Firearms Parts and Ammunition, 15 Gold Bars 1 Ounce Each, 1883 Morgan Silver Dollar, 1908 United States 2 1/2 Dollar Coin, 2 2015 United States Gold Coins 1 Ounce Each, 2 Collector Coins (1 Gairsoppa, 1 Al Capone), 2 Generic Silver Coins With Buffalo 1 Ounce Each, 2015 Toyota Tundra Crewmax Limited, VIN: 5tfhw5f14fx430497, 2015 Toyota Tundra Crewmax SR5, VIN: 5tfdw5f13fx447662, 25 2015 Canadian Maple Mint Coins 1 Ounce Each, 25 Pamp Suisse Gold Bars 1 Gram Each, 43 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 5 Ounces Each, 5 MX Dos Pesos Coins, 500 2015 ASE Silver Coins, 500 2015 and 2014 Silver Coins, 500 Canadian Maple Silver Coins 1 Ounce Each, 500 West Point Silver Coins, 7 Generic Silver Coins 1 Ounce Each, Canadian Cougar Coin 1 Ounce, Canadian Maple Leaf Coin 1 Ounce, Canadian Maple Leaf Gold Coin 1/10 Ounce, Four Horsemen of The Apocalypse Silver Set, Gairsoppa Shipwreck Silver Bar 10 Ounces, Morgan Silver Bar 10 Ounces, Noahs Ark Silver Coin 10 Ounces, Pamp Suisse Gold Bar 2.5 Grams, Provident Silver Bar 10 Ounces, Sunshine Mint Gold Bar 5 Grams, Sunshine Mint Silver Bar 100 Ounces, Tyrannosaurus Rex Silver Coin Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #3 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 10413 County Road 76 1/2, Windsor, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,064.34 Seized From Wells Fargo Account 9048072798
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,746.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 25 Pamp Suisse Gold Bars 1 Gram Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian Cougar Coin 1 Ounce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Mint Gold Bar 5 Grams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Toyota Tundra Crewmax SR5, VIN: 5tfdw5f13fx447662
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 123 Miscellaneous Firearms Parts and Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Toyota Tundra Crewmax Limited, VIN: 5tfhw5f14fx430497
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Horsemen of The Apocalypse Silver Set
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $65,034.16 Seized From First Bank Account 8145510716
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrannosaurus Rex Silver Coin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Silver Bar 10 Ounces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 500 West Point Silver Coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1908 United States 2 1/2 Dollar Coin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gairsoppa Shipwreck Silver Bar 10 Ounces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 MX Dos Pesos Coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noahs Ark Silver Coin 10 Ounces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,887.75 Seized From First Bank Account 8142726343
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian Maple Leaf Gold Coin 1/10 Ounce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 43 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 5 Ounces Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 2015 United States Gold Coins 1 Ounce Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 1 Ounce Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Sunshine Mint Silver Bars 10 Ounces Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamp Suisse Gold Bar 2.5 Grams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian Maple Leaf Coin 1 Ounce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $724.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 500 2015 ASE Silver Coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 500 Canadian Maple Silver Coins 1 Ounce Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 500 2015 and 2014 Silver Coins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Silver Bar 10 Ounces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Mint Silver Bar 100 Ounces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 Generic Silver Coins With Buffalo 1 Ounce Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 Collector Coins (1 Gairsoppa, 1 Al Capone)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10413 County Road 76 1/2, Windsor, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 15 Gold Bars 1 Ounce Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1883 Morgan Silver Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 25 2015 Canadian Maple Mint Coins 1 Ounce Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 Generic Silver Coins 1 Ounce Each
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna E Stroh
Represented By: Brian Rowland Leedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael John Suppes
Represented By: Lisa A. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?