Brink et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: David Brink, Mark Hille, Suzann Hille, Nancy Brink, Darla Rostveit and Ingwald Rostveit
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03041
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Koehler, Jonathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Koehler, Jonathan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/19/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/19/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint , Separate and Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, N.A..(Koehler, Jonathan)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set January 23, 2020 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/17/19. (rbjsec. )
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-3041-RBJ (angar, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03041-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Koehler, Jonathan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 17 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY at Fault Pursuant to C.R.S. Section13-21-111.5 by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Koehler, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Mayle, Nicholas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Mayle, Nicholas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Bank of America, N.A. served on 11/27/2019. (Mayle, Nicholas)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.Attorney Amy M. Samberg added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Thomas Koehler on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.Attorney Jonathan Thomas Koehler added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft) (Koehler, Jonathan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Koehler, Jonathan)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/29/2019. Consent Form due by 1/9/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Henry Azbell on behalf of David Brink, Nancy Brink, Mark Hille, Suzann Hille, Darla Rostveit, Ingwald RostveitAttorney Joseph Henry Azbell added to party David Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Henry Azbell added to party Nancy Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Henry Azbell added to party Mark Hille(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Henry Azbell added to party Suzann Hille(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Henry Azbell added to party Darla Rostveit(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Henry Azbell added to party Ingwald Rostveit(pty:pla) (Azbell, Joseph)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas W. Mayle on behalf of David Brink, Nancy Brink, Mark Hille, Suzann Hille, Darla Rostveit, Ingwald RostveitAttorney Nicholas W. Mayle added to party David Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas W. Mayle added to party Nancy Brink(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas W. Mayle added to party Mark Hille(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas W. Mayle added to party Suzann Hille(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas W. Mayle added to party Darla Rostveit(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas W. Mayle added to party Ingwald Rostveit(pty:pla) (Mayle, Nicholas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER re: Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Mesa County District Judge Gretchen Buck Larson on 10/10/19. (trvo, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC, filed by Darla Rostveit, Mark Hille, Nancy Brink, David Brink, Suzann Hille, Ingwald Rostveit.(trvo, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, filed by Darla Rostveit, Mark Hille, Nancy Brink, David Brink, Suzann Hille, Ingwald Rostveit.(trvo, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC from Mesa County District Court, Case Number 2019CV30403. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6961542), filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Cv Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. B- Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-1st Amd Compl, #4 Exhibit Ex. D- EOA Koehler, #5 Exhibit Ex. E- EOA Samberg, #6 Exhibit Ex. F- Mtn EOT, #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Prop Order, #8 Exhibit Ex. H- Order, #9 Exhibit Ex. I- Serv Process, #10 Exhibit Ex. J- Email, #11 Exhibit Ex. K- Email Benavidez, #12 Exhibit Ex. L- Ntc Rem State, #13 Exhibit Ex. M-Register of Act, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Civ Cov Sheet-Fed)(Koehler, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brink et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brink
Represented By: Nicholas W. Mayle
Represented By: Joseph Henry Azbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hille
Represented By: Nicholas W. Mayle
Represented By: Joseph Henry Azbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzann Hille
Represented By: Nicholas W. Mayle
Represented By: Joseph Henry Azbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Brink
Represented By: Nicholas W. Mayle
Represented By: Joseph Henry Azbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Rostveit
Represented By: Nicholas W. Mayle
Represented By: Joseph Henry Azbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingwald Rostveit
Represented By: Nicholas W. Mayle
Represented By: Joseph Henry Azbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Koehler
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?