Jackson v. C.R. Bard Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kayla Jackson
Defendant: C.R. Bard Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03043
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER re: 17 Case Reassigned. In light of the reassignment, the Status Conference set 11/21/19 is vacated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03043-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Gansborg, Blake)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory David Rueb on behalf of Kayla JacksonAttorney Gregory David Rueb added to party Kayla Jackson(pty:pla) (Rueb, Gregory)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER:A Status Conference is set for 11/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. On or before 11/14/2019 the parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/30/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Blake A. Gansborg on behalf of All Defendants (Gansborg, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Shaun Polston on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Christopher Shaun Polston added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Shaun Polston added to party C.R. Bard Inc.(pty:dft) (Polston, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Richard B. North, Jr added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. North, Jr added to party C.R. Bard Inc.(pty:dft) (North, Richard)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Brian Lerner on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Matthew Brian Lerner added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Brian Lerner added to party C.R. Bard Inc.(pty:dft) (Lerner, Matthew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Thomas Clouatre on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Mark Thomas Clouatre added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Thomas Clouatre added to party C.R. Bard Inc.(pty:dft) (Clouatre, Mark)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Blake A. Gansborg on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Blake A. Gansborg added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Blake A. Gansborg added to party C.R. Bard Inc.(pty:dft) (Gansborg, Blake)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02239. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Colorado via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.]
April 6, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2239-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.]
April 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16755237 filed by Kayla Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. C.R. Bard Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Jackson
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Shaun Polston
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Blake A. Gansborg
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Matthew Brian Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Shaun Polston
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Blake A. Gansborg
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Matthew Brian Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?