Universal Music Corporation et al v. Larimer Exchange L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corporation, Joe's Songs Inc. and Jobete Music Co., Inc.
Defendant: Loy Merck and Larimer Exchange L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03077
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiffs Jobete Music Co., Inc., Joe's Songs Inc., Universal Music Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Swanson, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/30/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/30/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 1/6/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (agarc, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Swanson, Paul)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larimer Exchange L.L.C., Loy Merck (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6966855)Attorney Paul Douglas Swanson added to party Jobete Music Co., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Douglas Swanson added to party Joe's Songs Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Douglas Swanson added to party Universal Music Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Universal Music Corporation, Jobete Music Co., Inc., Joe's Songs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Larimer Exchange L.L.C., #4 Summons - Loy Merck)(Swanson, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Music Corporation et al v. Larimer Exchange L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corporation
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe's Songs Inc.
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobete Music Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loy Merck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer Exchange L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?