Dury v. True
Petitioner: Matthew James Dury
Respondent: ADX Florence and True
Case Number: 1:2019cv03078
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 Sworn Affidavit for Criminal Acts, by Mathew J. Dury (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (apesa, ) Modified on 12/19/2019 to correct text (apesa, ).
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Matthew James Dury. (angar, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Matthew James Dury.(angar, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to Court of Direct Act of Terrorism of Torture, by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (angar, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Applicant has filed two Notices (ECF Nos. #5 , #6 ). The Notices contain unsubstantiated allegations regarding the Court; however, it also appears that Applicant requests copies of the forms needed to cure deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/13/2019. forms mailed as ordered (angar, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to the court by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (evana, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Court Violation of Federal Laws by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (evana, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order the action may be dismissed without further notice. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on the incorrect form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/29/2019.(angar, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Petitioner Matthew James Dury. (alave, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Matthew James Dury.(alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dury v. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ADX Florence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew James Dury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?