Grady v. Pueblo County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Grady
Defendant: No Named Defendant, Correctional Health Partners, Pueblo County Sheriff's Office and Pueblo County Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv03095
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #7 ) is granted. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/23/2019. (Copy mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Jerry Grady. (rvill, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Pueblo County Detention Center, Pueblo County Sheriff's Office, Correctional Health Partners, filed by Jerry Grady.(rvill, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's request for an extension of time (ECF No. #4 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 30, 2019, to cure the deficiencies in this action as previously directed. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure all of the deficiencies within the time allowed. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/15/2019. (rvill, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Letter re: IFP and Extension of Time by Plaintiff Jerry Grady. (rvill, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/30/2019. (Forms mailed as ordered) (rvill, ) Modified to correct file date on 10/31/2019 (rvill, ).
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 LETTER by Plaintiff Jerry Grady. (agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady v. Pueblo County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pueblo County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pueblo County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?