Zastrow et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Zastrow and John Zastrow
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv03101
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 72 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/16/2019. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam Daniel Peavy on behalf of John Zastrow, Sarah ZastrowAttorney Adam Daniel Peavy added to party John Zastrow(pty:pla), Attorney Adam Daniel Peavy added to party Sarah Zastrow(pty:pla) (Peavy, Adam)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. IT IS ORDERED that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. To appear by telephone, the Parties shall initiate a joint status conference amongst themselves prior to calling the Court at the time of the Conference. The Parties shall be prepared to discuss: (1) the need to reopen discovery; (2) the pending Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [#40 ]; and (3) whether this case is ready to be set for trial. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/3/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
December 3, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn Grace Hooten on behalf of John Zastrow, Sarah ZastrowAttorney Kathryn Grace Hooten added to party John Zastrow(pty:pla), Attorney Kathryn Grace Hooten added to party Sarah Zastrow(pty:pla) (Hooten, Kathryn)
December 3, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Anthony Love on behalf of John Zastrow, Sarah ZastrowAttorney Scott Anthony Love added to party John Zastrow(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Anthony Love added to party Sarah Zastrow(pty:pla) (Love, Scott)
December 3, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Michael Moreland on behalf of John Zastrow, Sarah ZastrowAttorney William Michael Moreland added to party John Zastrow(pty:pla), Attorney William Michael Moreland added to party Sarah Zastrow(pty:pla) (Moreland, William)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/18/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 65 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #64 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03101-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 64 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson All parties do not consent.. (O'Brien, Sarah)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT [#60 , #61 , #62 ] Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson filed three motions requesting the Court allow Attorneys Susan M. Robinson, Kari L. Sutherland, and William M. Gage, respectively, to withdraw as attorneys of record in this matter. These attorneys have not filed Entries of Appearance in this district or otherwise appeared in this matter after it was transferred from the Southern District of West Virginia. Therefore, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(b), Defendants' motions to withdraw are moot. Thus, IT IS ORDERED that the Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants remain represented by Attorneys David Gregory Mayhan and Sarah Smyth O'Brien. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/7/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
November 6, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Withdraw Susan M. Robinson as Counsel for Defendants by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Brien, Sarah)
November 6, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw Kari L. Sutherland as Counsel for Defendants by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Brien, Sarah)
November 6, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Withdraw William M. Gage as Counsel for Defendants by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Brien, Sarah)
November 5, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Gregory Mayhan on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & JohnsonAttorney David Gregory Mayhan added to party Ethicon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Gregory Mayhan added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft) (Mayhan, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Smyth O'Brien on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & JohnsonAttorney Sarah Smyth O'Brien added to party Ethicon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Smyth O'Brien added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft) (O'Brien, Sarah)
October 31, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa Paige Orgel on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Melissa Paige Orgel added to party John Zastrow(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Paige Orgel added to party Sarah Zastrow(pty:pla) (Orgel, Melissa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Thomas Goodwin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Daniel Thomas Goodwin added to party John Zastrow(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Thomas Goodwin added to party Sarah Zastrow(pty:pla) (Goodwin, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 52 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-02421. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 30, 2019 Filing 55 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 54 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 53 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 51 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF#49 Continued, ECF#3767 Part 1 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF#3767 Part 2 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF#3767 Part 3 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF#3767 Part 4 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF#3855 - Reply in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit ECF#6648 - Notice of Adoption of Motion, #7 Exhibit ECF#6833 - Amended Notice of Adoption of Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF#6926 - Notice of Adoption of Response, #9 Exhibit ECF#7123 - Notice of Adoption of Reply, #10 Exhibit ECF#2209 - Reply in Support of Motion, #11 Exhibit ECF#3031 - Reply in Support of Motion, #12 Exhibit ECF#3642 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF#3642 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF#3647 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF#3751 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF#3847 - Reply to Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF#6649 - Notice of Adoption of Motion, #18 Exhibit ECF#6955 - Notice of Adoption of Response, #19 Exhibit ECF#7125 - Notice of Adoption of Reply, #20 Exhibit ECF#2817 - Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF#2818 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF#2931 - Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF#5332 - Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF#5333 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF#5482 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #26 Exhibit ECF#5548 - Reply in Support of Motion, #27 Exhibit ECF#6852 - Notice of Adoption of Motion, #28 Exhibit ECF#6960 - Notice of Adoption of Response)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 50 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF#49 Continued, ECF#2287 Part 1 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF#2287 Part 2 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF#2297 - Reply to Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF#2825 - Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF#2826 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit ECF#2942 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF#3053 - Reply to Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF#6824 - Notice of Adoption of Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF#6998 - Notice of Adoption of Response, #10 Exhibit ECF#7100 - Notice of Adoption of Reply, #11 Exhibit ECF#2060 - Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF#2065 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF#2134 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF#2232 - Reply to Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF#2910 - Supplemental Response and Notice of Adoption of Response, #16 Exhibit ECF#6860 - Notice of Adoption of Motion, #17 Exhibit ECF#6965 - Notice of Adoption of Response, #18 Exhibit ECF#7143 - Notice of Adoption of Reply, #19 Exhibit ECF#3588 - Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF#3589 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF#3758 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF#3840 - Reply to Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF#6841 - Notice of Adoption of Motion, #24 Exhibit ECF#6950 - Notice of Adoption of Response, #25 Exhibit ECF#3626 Part 1 - Motion to Limit, #26 Exhibit ECF#3626 Part 2 - Motion to Limit)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 49 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #238 - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit ECF #239 - Master Answer of Ethicon, #3 Exhibit ECF #241 - Master Answer of J&J, #4 Exhibit ECF #262 - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF #263 - Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF #2280 - Reply in Support of Motion, #7 Exhibit ECF #2854 - Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #2855 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF #2913 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #3048 - Reply in Support of Motion, #11 Exhibit ECF #6799 - Amended Notice of Adoption of Motion, #12 Exhibit ECF #6987 - Notice of Adoption of Response, #13 Exhibit ECF #7094 - Notice of Adoption of Response, #14 Exhibit ECF #2006 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #2008 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #16 Exhibit ECF #2160 - Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #2238 - Reply in Support of Motion, #18 Exhibit ECF #6806 - Notice of Adoption of Motion, #19 Exhibit ECF #6971 - Notice of Adoption of Response, #20 Exhibit ECF #7096 - Notice of Adoption of Reply, #21 Exhibit ECF #6882 - Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF #6885 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF #7029 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #2205 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #2205 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #26 Exhibit ECF #2205 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/30/2019 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/30/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow in opposition to #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Clark, Clayton) (Modified on 11/5/2018 to remove link to #41 memorandum in support) (rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Bueno, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bueno, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson For Extension of Expert Deadline and Supporting Memorandum. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/3/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kathryn Grace Hooten on behalf of John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow. (Hooten, Kathryn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 37 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Sarah Zastrow, John Zastrow (Amstutz, Paige) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add party filers)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow in support of #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson For Extension of Expert Deadline and Supporting Memorandum. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Shelley Van Natter Hutson on behalf of John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow. (Hutson, Shelley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson For Extension of Expert Deadline and Supporting Memorandum. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 32 AMENDED CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Cristin Panzarella, M.D. on September 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. M.D.T. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Bueno, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 31 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Cristin Panzarella, M.D.. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 30 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Alexander Shapiro, M.D.. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 29 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Custodian of Records for Kaiser Permanente. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow of Cristin Panzarella on September 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 27 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Alexander Shapiro, M.D. on September 18, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. M.D.T. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bueno, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 26 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Cristin Panzarella, M.D. on September 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Bueno, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow of Cristin Panzarella, M.D. on September 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow of Alexander Shapiro, M.D. on September 18, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Sarah Zastrow on September 14, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. MDT (Bueno, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by John William Ellis on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Ellis, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum of Custodian of Records for Kaiser Permanente by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kimberly Gustafson Bueno on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Bueno, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow of Alexander Shapiro, M.D. on September 29, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moreland, W.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow of Cristin Panzarella, M.D. on September 18, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moreland, W.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (pma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
June 17, 2017 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Sarah Zastrow. (Moreland, W.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow to Reinstate Case to Active Docket; the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove the inactive docket flag and reinstate this case to the active docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/7/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION by John Zastrow, Sarah Zastrow to Reinstate Case to Active Docket (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the Plaintiff(s) and Defendants have reached a settlement. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Defendants may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 11/01/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 3007 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/28/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kll) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 15, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 10, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 4, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
October 2, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
February 22, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
February 12, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 37 (Revised Verifications and Authorizations attached to Plaintiff Profile Form) entered on 01/24/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Verifications and Authorizations) (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]
February 12, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2221916. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zastrow et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: David Gregory Mayhan
Represented By: Sarah Smyth O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David Gregory Mayhan
Represented By: Sarah Smyth O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Zastrow
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Goodwin
Represented By: Melissa Paige Orgel
Represented By: Kathryn Grace Hooten
Represented By: Scott Anthony Love
Represented By: Adam Daniel Peavy
Represented By: William Michael Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Zastrow
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Goodwin
Represented By: Melissa Paige Orgel
Represented By: Kathryn Grace Hooten
Represented By: Scott Anthony Love
Represented By: Adam Daniel Peavy
Represented By: William Michael Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?