Crow v. Denver Diognost Reception Center Prision et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Eugene Crow
Defendant: Angle Julmy, Denver Diognost Reception Center Prision, Quarles Leto and Michelle R. Barry
Case Number: 1:2019cv03105
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff a copy of the court-approved forms for filing a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff shall cure the filing deficiencies noted in the November 4 Order within 30 days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/16/2019. (Mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER by Plaintiff Bradley Eugene Crow. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rvill, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Inmate MOTION Requesting to File Without Prepayment of Filing/Service Fees by Plaintiff Bradley Eugene Crow. (rvill, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. A copy of the November 4, 2019 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. #4 ) was mistakenly sent to Plaintiff at his former address and has been returned to the Court as undeliverable. (ECF No. #5 ). The clerk of the court is directed to resend to Plaintiff, at the San Carlos Correctional Facility, a copy of the November 4 cure order. Plaintiff shall cure the filing deficiencies noted in the November 4 Order within 30 days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of thisaction without prejudice and without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/14/2019. (Copy mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 3 Case Assigned to Judge, #2 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, #1 Complaint, addressed to Bradley Eugene Crow. (rvill, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. The clerk's office shall change Plaintiff's address in the electronic docket (CM/ECF) to reflect that he is incarcerated at the San Carlos Correctional Facility. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/04/2019. (rvill, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Bradley Eugene Crow. (alave, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Angle Julmy, Michelle R. Barry, Denver Diognost Reception Center Prision, Quarles Leto, filed by Bradley Eugene Crow.(alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow v. Denver Diognost Reception Center Prision et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angle Julmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Diognost Reception Center Prision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quarles Leto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle R. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Eugene Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?