Zhang v. Lambrecht et al
Plaintiff: XING KANG ZHANG, Hsing Kang Zhang and Hsing Kan Zhang
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN, United States Department of Homeland Security, The, Acting Director Kenneth CUCCINELLI, Field Office Dir. ANDREW LAMBRECHT, Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin K McAleenan and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv03111
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03111-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/13/2019. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case to an Article III District Judge. (tsher, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03111-MEH. (athom, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to LAMBRECHT, CUCCINELLI, MCALEENAN, USCIS, USDHS by Plaintiff XING KANG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(McIntyre, Charles)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Kenneth CUCCINELLI, ANDREW LAMBRECHT, Kevin MCALEENAN, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States Department of Homeland Security, The (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6981076)Attorney Charles Stafford McIntyre, IV added to party XING KANG ZHANG(pty:pla), filed by XING KANG ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(McIntyre, Charles)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang v. Lambrecht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. ANDREW LAMBRECHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XING KANG ZHANG
Represented By: Charles Stafford McIntyre, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hsing Kang Zhang
Represented By: Charles Stafford McIntyre, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hsing Kan Zhang
Represented By: Charles Stafford McIntyre, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?