Washington v. Head of Mental Health et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Emerson Washington
Defendant: Jane Doe, Head of Mental Health and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv03129
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/20/2019. (angar, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/19/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-3129-LTB-GPG (angar, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/18/2019. (angar, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Answer to the Court Order, by Plaintiff Darnell Emerson Washington. (angar, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Mr. Washington shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint as directed in this order. If Mr. Washington fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the claims other than the Eighth Amendment mental health treatment claim will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/12/2019. (rvill, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 Leave to proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The incomplete Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #4 ) is denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/4/2019.(angar, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Darnell Emerson Washington. (alave, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Darnell Emerson Washington. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Account Activity)(alave, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, John Doe, Head of Mental Health, filed by Darnell Emerson Washington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Head of Mental Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Head of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Emerson Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?