Kilman v. Daley et al
Plaintiff: Tobi Kilman
Defendant: Tyler S. Brown, Arapahoe County Detention Facility, Pat Sullivan, Boyd, Thomas Daley and Aramark Correctional Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03136
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #6 Amended Complaint filed by Tobi Kilman by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/23/2019. (rvill, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/23/2019. (rvill, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/20/2019. (rvill, )
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Evidence (ECF No. #7 ) filed December 9, 2019, is DENIED as moot because the documents Plaintiff is asking the Court to consider are attached to his amended Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #6 ). By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/16/2019. (rvill, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Enter Evidence by Plaintiff Tobi Kilman. (rvill, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Tyler S. Brown, Thomas Daley, Pat Sullivan, Boyd, Aramark Correctional Services, LLC, filed by Tobi Kilman.(rvill, )
November 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiff file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this order that provides a short and plain statement of each claim he is asserting as discussed in this order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/10/2019. (rvill, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #3 ) is granted. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/07/2019. (Copy mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Tobi Kilman. (trvo, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (trvo, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Arapahoe County Detention Facility, Tyler S. Brown, filed by Tobi Kilman.(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilman v. Daley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobi Kilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Correctional Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?