Le Petit-Fils De L.U. Chopard & CIE SA et al v. High Country Millwork, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chopard USA, LTD and Le Petit-Fils De L.U. Chopard & CIE SA
Defendant: High Country Millwork, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03139
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Dismissal. Plaintiffs' F.R.C.P. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice [#7 ] is approved. All currently pending deadlines are vacated. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/04/2019. (athom, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Chopard USA, LTD, Le Petit-Fils De L.U. Chopard & CIE SA (Frazier, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Le Petit-Fils De L.U. Chopard & CIE SA, Chopard USA, LTD. High Country Millwork, Inc. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Frazier, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/14/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/1/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/7/2019. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against High Country Millwork, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6981043)Attorney Michael O. Frazier added to party Chopard USA, LTD (pty:pla), Attorney Michael O. Frazier added to party Le Petit-Fils De L.U. Chopard & CIE SA(pty:pla), filed by Le Petit-Fils De L.U. Chopard & CIE SA, Chopard USA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frazier, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le Petit-Fils De L.U. Chopard & CIE SA et al v. High Country Millwork, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Country Millwork, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chopard USA, LTD
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Petit-Fils De L.U. Chopard & CIE SA
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?