Brewer-Kronberg v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2019cv03188
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Life Insurance Company of North America's answer is due 1/10/2020. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/17/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Df's MFET)(Englert, Jack)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/19. (rbjsec.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Life Insurance Company of North America re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg. (Krieger, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6989245)Attorney Michael Scott Krieger added to party Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg(pty:pla), filed by Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Krieger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer-Kronberg v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg
Represented By: Michael Scott Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?