Wynne v. Jagged Peak Energy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sherrie Wynne
Defendant: Dheeraj Verma, Michael C. Linn, Blake A. Webster, Charles D. Davidson, John R. Sult, Janeen S. Judah, Adrianna C. Ma, S. Wil Vanloh, Roger L. Jarvis and Jagged Peak Energy Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03281
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 Case Terminated pursuant to #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 1/9/2020. Text Only Entry (tsher, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne (Enright, Donald)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Blake A. Webster by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Dheeraj Verna by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to S. Wil VanLoh, Jr. by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to John R. Sult by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Adrianna C. Ma by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Michael C. Linn by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Janeen S. Judah by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Roger L. Jarvis by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jagged Peak Energy Inc. by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Charles D. Davidson by Plaintiff Sherrie Wynne. (Enright, Donald)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/21/2019. Consent Form due by 1/28/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. The summonses submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. All parties must be listed. Please file completed summonses for issuance using the event Summons Request. (trvo, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Darwin Davidson, Jagged Peak Energy Inc, Roger L. Jarvis, Janeen S. Judah, Michael C. Linn, Adrianna C. Ma, John R. Sult, S. Wil Vanloh, Jr, Dheeraj Verma, Blake A. Webster (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7006440)Attorney Donald James Enright added to party Sherrie Wynne(pty:pla), filed by Sherrie Wynne. (Attachments: #1 Summons Charles D. Davidson, #2 Summons Jagged Peak Energy, #3 Summons Roger L. Jarvis, #4 Summons Janeen S. Judah, #5 Summons Michael C. Linn, #6 Summons Adrianna C. Ma, #7 Summons John R. Sult, #8 Summons S. Wil VanLoh, Jr., #9 Summons Dheeraj Verna, #10 Summons Blake A. Webster, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Enright, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wynne v. Jagged Peak Energy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dheeraj Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Sult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janeen S. Judah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrianna C. Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Wil Vanloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger L. Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jagged Peak Energy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Wynne
Represented By: Donald James Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?