Bunecke v. United States Air Force Academy et al
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Bunecke
Defendant: United States Air Force Academy and United States Department of the Air Force
Case Number: 1:2019cv03329
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Status Conference. Status Conference set 1/29/2020 is vacated. This matter is stayed up to and including 5/1/2020. All deadlines are stayed. Joint Status Reports due every 60 days, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/21/2020. (ebuch)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Status Conference by Plaintiff Joseph L. Bunecke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kennedy, Shaun)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Status/Scheduling Hearing set for 1/29/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/7/2020. (ebuch)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, up to and including 1/23/2020, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/31/2019. (ebuch)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for January 22, 2020 is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/31/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03329-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Joseph L. Bunecke All parties do not consent.. (Kennedy, Shaun)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants United States Department of the Air Force, United States Air Force Academy. All Defendants. (Brenton, Kyle)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party United States Air Force Academy(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party United States Department of the Air Force(pty:dft) (Brenton, Kyle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph L. Bunecke. United States Air Force Academy served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; United States Department of the Air Force served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Kennedy, Shaun)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/22/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 1/15/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/2/2019. (ksena)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Air Force Academy, United States Department of the Air Force (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7013909)Attorney Shaun Christopher Kennedy added to party Joseph L. Bunecke(pty:pla), filed by Joseph L. Bunecke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons U.S. Air Force Academy, #11 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #12 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office - Denver, #13 Summons U.S. Department of the Air Force)(Kennedy, Shaun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunecke v. United States Air Force Academy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force Academy
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Air Force
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Bunecke
Represented By: Shaun Christopher Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?