Arguello v. Water Resources Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jerry E. Arguello and Robert S Stanek
Defendant: Water Resources Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03360
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs Jerry E. Arguello, Robert S Stanek. (Breen, Christine)
January 21, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Related Cases - Jointly Filed by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc. (Sellers, Nathan)
January 14, 2020 Filing 35 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Status Conference held on 1/14/2020. Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim due by 2/19/2020. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
January 13, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
January 11, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Jerry E. Arguello, Robert S Stanek. (Breen, Christine)
January 9, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna Capri Rutigliano on behalf of Water Resources Group, Inc.Attorney Anna Capri Rutigliano added to party Water Resources Group, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Anna Capri Rutigliano added to party Water Resources Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Rutigliano, Anna)
December 24, 2019 Filing 31 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #28 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint, filed by attorney Christine Elizabeth Breen. The s/ signatures did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: Non-Evidentiary Hearing and Status Conference on Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief Against Water Resources Group, Inc. #22 set for 1/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore on the sixth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/23/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint /Counter Claims by Counter Defendants Robert S Stanek, Jerry E. Arguello. Robert S Stanek answer due 1/20/2020; Jerry E. Arguello answer due 1/20/2020. (Breen, Christine)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/19/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/19/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 18, 2019 Filing 25 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #24 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03360-RM. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Sellers, Nathan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE Register of Actions and Party Information by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc. (Sellers, Nathan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief Against Water Resources Group, Inc. by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/13/2019 re: #20 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Water Resources Group, Inc. #13 Order to Show Cause is discharged. Consent Form due by 12/18/2019. (tsher, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #13 by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 COMPLAINT against Water Resources Group, Inc., filed by Jerry E. Arguello and Robert S Stanek.(rvill, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Nathan R. Sellers in Support regarding Response #17 by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stock Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018.1.24 Email re Negotiations, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018.2.22 Email re Negotiations (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 4 - 2018.03.01 Email transmitting executed Stanek Documents)(Sellers, Nathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Luke Spalj in Support regarding Response #17 by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #29 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Jerry E. Arguello, Robert S Stanek by Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer to Demand for Arbitration)(Sellers, Nathan) Modified to correct text on 12/20/2019 (rvill, ).
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by L Rhyddid Watkins on behalf of Water Resources Group, Inc.Attorney L Rhyddid Watkins added to party Water Resources Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Watkins, L)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Water Resources Group, Inc. AMENDED (Filing fee $ 400)., filed by Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Summons, #2 Exhibit 1B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1C - Arguello Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit 1D - Stanek Employment Agreement, #5 Exhibit 1E - Stock-Purchase-Agreement, #6 Exhibit 1F - Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit 1G - Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, #8 Exhibit 1H - Proposed Order re Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, #9 Exhibit 1I - Delay Reduction Order, #10 Exhibit 1J - Order - Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief Against Water Resources Group, #11 Exhibit 1K - Register of Actions and Party Information, #12 Exhibit 2 - Return of Service, #13 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Luke Spalj (Am. NOR), #14 Exhibit 4 - N. Sellers Declaration, #15 Exhibit 4A - Answer and Counterclaim, #16 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal of Civil Action (Col. District Court))(Sellers, Nathan)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/4/2019 returnable by Defendant Water Resources Group, Inc. as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2019. (tsher, ) Modified on 12/13/2019 to show as discharged pursuant to #21 Minute Order (tsher, ).
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christine Elizabeth Breen on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Christine Elizabeth Breen added to party Jerry E. Arguello(pty:pla), Attorney Christine Elizabeth Breen added to party Robert S Stanek(pty:pla) (Breen, Christine)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert J. Truhlar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Robert J. Truhlar added to party Jerry E. Arguello(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J. Truhlar added to party Robert S Stanek(pty:pla) (Truhlar, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (sphil, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case israndomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03360-NRN. (sphil, )
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 29, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Water Resources Group, Inc. on 18 November, 2019 (cmadr, )
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 29, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX092979 (cmadr, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Water Resources Group, Inc. from District Court - City and County of Denver, CO, Case Number 19CV34331. (Filing fee $ 400)., filed by Water Resources Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and all process, pleadings and orders in the State Court Action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service upon Water Resources Group, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Nathan R. Sellers, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Removal in the State Court Action, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sellers, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arguello v. Water Resources Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry E. Arguello
Represented By: Robert J. Truhlar
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S Stanek
Represented By: Robert J. Truhlar
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water Resources Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Robert Sellers
Represented By: Anna Capri Rutigliano
Represented By: L Rhyddid Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?