Roth v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gila Roth
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03370
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Courts December 2, 2019 Order and Continue Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/26/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/3/2020.(jgonz, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/3/20 regarding #7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling ConferenceUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's December 2, 2019 Order filed by Gila Roth. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's December 2, 2019 Order by Plaintiff Gila Roth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McDevitt, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gila Roth. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Thompson, Russell)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/2/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/7/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/2/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
November 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7019590)Attorney Russell S. Thompson, IV added to party Gila Roth(pty:pla), filed by Gila Roth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Thompson, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roth v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gila Roth
Represented By: Russell S. Thompson, IV
Represented By: David Neal McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?