Fabela v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Ma. Salazar Fabela
Defendant: Kristi Barrows, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States of America and USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03408
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of Kristi Barrows, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USAAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Kristi Barrows(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party USA(pty:dft) (Brenton, Kyle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff Ma. Salazar Fabela (Meade, Shawn)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/05/2019. (athom, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kristi Barrows by Plaintiff Ma. Salazar Fabela. (Meade, Shawn)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Plaintiff Ma. Salazar Fabela. (Meade, Shawn)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States of America by Plaintiff Ma. Salazar Fabela. (Meade, Shawn)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7027893)Attorney Shawn David Meade added to party Ma. Salazar Fabela(pty:pla), filed by Ma. Salazar Fabela. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Meade, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fabela v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Barrows
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma. Salazar Fabela
Represented By: Shawn David Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?