Seale v. Peacock
Plaintiff: Bryan Seale
Defendant: John Jane Doe and Gary Peacock
Case Number: 1:2019cv03559
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER the Scheduling Conference is Reset for 2/25/2020 11:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/6/2020. Text Only Entry (ksena)
February 5, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Charles Rupprecht by Bradley T. Bufkin on behalf of Bryan Seale (Bufkin, Bradley)
February 5, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew L. Schneider by Bradley T. Bufkin on behalf of Bryan Seale (Bufkin, Bradley)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: Due to a medical emergency, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:15 AM is VACATED. No later than 2/10/2020, the parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers, 719-575-0328, to reset the Scheduling Conference. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/5/20. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
February 3, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Service of Process Upon Unknown Defendants by Plaintiff Bryan Seale. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bufkin, Bradley)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #26 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/31/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 27 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Bryan Seale. (Bufkin, Bradley)
January 30, 2020 Filing 26 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Bryan Seale All parties consent.. (Bufkin, Bradley)
January 27, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Gary Peacock. (Kuhn, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Bryan Seale. (Bufkin, Bradley)
January 13, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Gary Peacock. (Kuhn, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Forrest Lewis on behalf of Gary PeacockAttorney Paul Forrest Lewis added to party Gary Peacock(pty:dft) (Lewis, Paul)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Edward Swan on behalf of Gary PeacockAttorney Andrew Edward Swan added to party Gary Peacock(pty:dft) (Swan, Andrew)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, as it is directed at the now non-operative complaint. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/9/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gary Peacock, filed by Bryan Seale.(jgonz, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Bryan Seale (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bufkin, Bradley)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: No later than January 9, 2020, Plaintiff may file his Amended Complaint without strikes through and underlines. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/8/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Attorney Bradley T. Bufkin added to party Bryan Seale(pty:pla) filed by Plaintiff Bryan Seale. (Bufkin, Bradley)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Bryan Seale (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bufkin, Bradley)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/10/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/3/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/19/2019. (ksena)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Gary Peacock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Kuhn, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03559-KMT. (athom, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of State Court Hearing by Defendant Gary Peacock (Kuhn, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Gary Peacock on 11/27/2019. (trvo, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Gary Peacock, filed by Bryan Seale.(trvo, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Filings by Defendant Gary Peacock (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit (State Court) Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Return of Service, #5 Exhibit Status Report and Motion Requesting Initial Status Conference, #6 Exhibit Notice of Hearing, #7 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Initial Status Conference)(Kuhn, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal of Filing of Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Gary Peacock (Kuhn, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Gary Peacock (Kuhn, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gary Peacock from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2019CV032545. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7048258), filed by Gary Peacock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kuhn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seale v. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Seale
Represented By: Bradley T. Bufkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Peacock
Represented By: Michael Dickson Kuhn
Represented By: Andrew Edward Swan
Represented By: Paul Forrest Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?