Twiford v. Correctional Health Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rainer James Twiford Jr. and James Rainer Twiford, Jr.
Defendant: Steven Dawson, Wellington Duplessis, Monika Lovric, David Spicer, Laura Ethridge, Dominic Montoya, Michael Chitwood, Felix Gallardo, Jacob Bookout, Caleb Gonzales, Vanessa Padilla, Ely Dynes, Cassie Simmons, Kirk M. Taylor, Doe Corporations 1-10, Board of County Commissioners Pueblo County, Christina Kutnak, Eric Woodruff, Jill Hoggarth, Leah Baynes, Last Name Unknown Donna, Stefanie Arnold, Alexa Komornic, Jacob Mahan, Chaz Bryant, Michael Quintana, Curtis Martindale, Maria Dorn, Sykes First Name Unknown, Shelley Bryant, Robert Vigil, Sharon Allen, Jane Does 1-10, Jonathan Slater, Sandy Purkett, Mandy Barreras, Nicolas Berumen, John 1-10 Does, Jeremy Cardona, Charlee Mercer, Christopher Molina, Roman Hijar, Correctional Health Partners, LLC, Matthew Mattot, Briana Boughton, Physician Health Partners LLC, William Carrero, Rebecca Alderton, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Pueblo, Physician Health Partners, LLC, Donna, Sykes, Kirk (I) M. Taylor and Pueblo County
Case Number: 1:2019cv03587
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 ***Party John & Jane Does 1-10 and Doe Corporations 1-10, added. Party Shelley Bryant (individually ), Michael Chitwood (individually ), Ely Dynes (individually ), Alexa Komornic (individually ), Jacob Mahan (individually ), Curtis Martindale (individually ), Christopher Molina (individually ), Dominic Montoya (individually ), Vanessa Padilla (individually ), Michael Quintana (individually ), Sykes ([First Name Unknown], individually, John and Jane Does 1-10, and Doe Corporations 1-10), Jacob Bookout (individually ) and Chaz Bryant (individually ) terminated., filed by James Rainer Twiford, Jr.(apesa, )
February 13, 2020 ***Party Michael Quintana added.Party Maria Dorn (individually ), Caleb Gonzales (individually ), Christina Kutnak (individually ), Monika Lovric (individually ), Charlee Mercer (individually ), Cassie Simmons (individually ), Jonathan Slater (individually ), Kirk M. Taylor (in his official capacity as Pueblo County Sheriff), Kirk (I) M. Taylor (individually ), Eric Woodruff (individually ), Rebecca Alderton (individually ) and Donna ([Last Name Unknown], individually ) terminated., filed by James Rainer Twiford, Jr.(apesa, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Rainer Twiford, Jr.(Schindler, Alan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schindler, Alan)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Physician Health Partners, LLC by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/12/20. Text Only Entry(jdyne, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Physician Health Partners, LLC (Stipulated) by Defendant Physician Health Partners, LLC. (Ringel, Andrew)
January 20, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marni Nathan Kloster on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of the County of PuebloAttorney Marni Nathan Kloster added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Pueblo(pty:dft) (Kloster, Marni)
January 20, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Christaan Poppe on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of the County of PuebloAttorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Pueblo(pty:dft) (Poppe, Nicholas)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, theScheduling Conference set March 2, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya will instead be heard by Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Each partys lead trial counsel shall attend the conference. The conference shall be held in Courtroom A-902, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/16/2020. (rbjsec. )
January 16, 2020 Filing 29 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #28 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03587-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 28 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr All parties do not consent.. (Schindler, Alan)
January 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Ben Gelman on behalf of Correctional Health Partners, LLCAttorney David Ben Gelman added to party Correctional Health Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Gelman, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Ringel on behalf of Correctional Health Partners, LLCAttorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Correctional Health Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Ringel, Andrew)
January 8, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Rainer Twiford, Jr. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Pueblo waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Schindler, Alan)
January 8, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Rainer Twiford, Jr. Correctional Health Partners, LLC waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Schindler, Alan)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/2/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/24/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/30/2019. (ksena)
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Physician Health Partners re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to County of Pueblo re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Correctional Health Partners re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 24, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 17 Administrative Notice: Summons for entries 11,12, and 13 will not be issued. No compliance with deficiency. Summons request entries 11,12, and 13 are still incomplete. (nmarb, ) .
December 24, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to County of Pueblo re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 24, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Correctional Health Partners re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Correctional Health Partners re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to County of Pueblo re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Physician Health Partners re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Correctional Health Partners re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Notice: Summonses are incomplete and will not be issued (Text Only Entry) (angar, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/23/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-3587-KMT (angar, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren E. Faraino on behalf of James Rainer Twiford, JrAttorney Lauren E. Faraino added to party James Rainer Twiford, Jr(pty:pla) (Faraino, Lauren)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Physician Health Partners re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to County of Pueblo re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Correctional Health Partners re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff James Rainer Twiford, Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Complaint,,,, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Rainer James Twiford Jr. (Schindler, Alan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rebecca Alderton, Sharon Allen, Stefanie Arnold, Mandy Barreras, Leah Baynes, Nicolas Berumen, Board of County Commissioners Pueblo County, Jacob Bookout, Briana Boughton, Chaz Bryant, Shelley Bryant, Jeremy Cardona, William Carrero, Michael Chitwood, Correctional Health Partners, LLC, Steven Dawson, Doe Corporations 1-10, John 1-10 Does, Jane Does 1-10, Last Name Unknown Donna, Maria Dorn, Wellington Duplessis, Ely Dynes, Laura Ethridge, Sykes First Name Unknown, Felix Gallardo, Caleb Gonzales, Roman Hijar, Jill Hoggarth, Alexa Komornic, Christina Kutnak, Monika Lovric, Jacob Mahan, Curtis Martindale, Matthew Mattot, Charlee Mercer, Christopher Molina, Dominic Montoya, Vanessa Padilla, Physician Health Partners LLC, Sandy Purkett, Michael Quintana, Cassie Simmons, Jonathan Slater, David Spicer, Kirk M. Taylor, Robert Vigil, Eric Woodruff (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7052791)Attorney Alan Daniel Schindler added to party Rainer James Twiford Jr. (pty:pla), filed by Rainer James Twiford Jr..(Schindler, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twiford v. Correctional Health Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington Duplessis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monika Lovric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Ethridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chitwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Bookout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ely Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassie Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners Pueblo County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Kutnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Hoggarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Baynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Last Name Unknown Donna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexa Komornic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaz Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Martindale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sykes First Name Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Purkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Barreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlee Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Hijar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Partners, LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: David Ben Gelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mattot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briana Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Health Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Carrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Alderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Pueblo
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Health Partners, LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk (I) M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pueblo County
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainer James Twiford Jr.
Represented By: Alan Daniel Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rainer Twiford, Jr.
Represented By: Alan Daniel Schindler
Represented By: Lauren E. Faraino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?