Dish Network LLC v. Antenas Enterprise, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dish Network LLC
Defendant: Antenas Enterprise, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03593
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/13/20. Consent Form due by 3/4/2020. Status Conference set for 3/18/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish DBS Corporation for Dish Network LLC. (Olsen, Richard)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7053639)Attorney Richard Robert Olsen added to party Dish Network LLC(pty:pla), filed by Dish Network LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit "B" in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit "C" in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #4 Affidavit of Richard Olsen in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #5 Summons on Defendant Antenas Enterprise, Inc., #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olsen, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network LLC v. Antenas Enterprise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antenas Enterprise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network LLC
Represented By: Richard Robert Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?