Wylie v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Plaintiff: James P. Wylie
Defendant: Sterling's HSA, Warden of Sterling and Executive Director of CDOC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03604
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the Court on a review of the docket and a request from the clerk's office for additional time to secure counsel pursuant to the Court's Appointment Order (ECF No. #10 ). Plaintiff shall have up to and including April 6, 2020, to file an amended complaint. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 02/13/2020. (rvill, )
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPOINTMENT ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #8 ) is granted. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (ECF No. #7 ) is granted and Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 6, 2020, to file an amended complaint as previously directed. Plaintiff's motion for a hearing (ECF No. 9) is denied. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 01/21/2020. (rvill, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 Moshn for Orul Hering [sic] by Plaintiff James P. Wylie. (rvill, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 Moshn for Appmitn of Cansol [sic] by Plaintiff James P. Wylie. (rvill, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 Moshn for Extinshn of Time [sic] by Plaintiff James P. Wylie. (rvill, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Mr. Wylie file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint as directed in this order. If Mr. Wylie fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 01/06/2020. (rvill, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Memorandum by Plaintiff James P. Wylie (angar, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is granted. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/20/2019.(rvill, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff James P. Wylie. (cmadr, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Executive Director of CDOC, Sterling's HSA, Warden of Sterling, filed by James P. Wylie.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wylie v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling's HSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director of CDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?