Nelson v. Talbot et al
Petitioner: Brett Andrew Nelson and Brett Andrew House of Nelson
Respondent: Lori Beth Talbot, Ashley M. Burgemeister, Donald Corwin Jackson, Keri Ann Yoder and Ashley Morgan Burgemeister
Case Number: 1:2019cv03643
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 19 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the Complaint (ECF No. #11 ) and the action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/20/2020. (evana, )
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: Perform duties set forth in D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1.; Hear and determine pretrial matters, including all nondispositive motions and other requests seeking court action; Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, at the magistrate judge's discretion; Submit recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions; Submit recommendations for disposition of all or part of this action as required under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, 28 U.S.C. 1915, 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and/or 42 U.S.C. 1997e; Determine and resolve nondispositive post-judgment motions and other requests seeking court action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/19/2020. (evana, )
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/18/2020. All future documents should be designated as 19-cv-3643 LTB. (evana, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Criminal Contempt and Motion for Protection Order by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (evana, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM of History of Arbitration by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (rvill, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #13 Order to Show Cause, by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (rvill, )
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiff show cause in writing within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why the action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. That, if Plaintiff fails to show good cause within the time allowed the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal will be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/17/2020. (evana, )
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #5 ) is GRANTED. That the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/14/2020.(evana, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ashley Morgan Burgemeister, Donald Corwin Jackson, Lori Beth Talbot, Keri Ann Yoder, filed by Brett Andrew Nelson.(evana, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 ADDENDUM to #7 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enter Judgment by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (evana, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiff has failed to cure all of the deficiencies as directed because he has not used the proper Complaint form approved for use in the District of Colorado. Plaintiff will be given one more opportunity to cure the remaining deficiency and must do so on or before January 31, 2020. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure the remaining deficiency within the time allowed. The clerk of the court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this Minute Order, a blank copy of the following form: Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/6/2020. (mailed as Ordered) (evana, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Final Arbitration Award by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson.. (evana, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enter Judgment by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Amended Memorandum in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)(evana, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ashley M. Burgemeister, Donald Corwin Jackson, Lori Beth Talbot, Keri Ann Yoder, filed by Brett Andrew Nelson.(evana, ) (Modified on 1/3/2020 Attached Correct PDF)(evana, ).
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (evana, )
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Petitioner files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That, if Petitioner fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/26/2019. (evana, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (rsams, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) Modified to correct file date on 12/24/2019 (rsams, ).
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enter Judgment, filed by Brett Andrew Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Talbot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brett Andrew Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brett Andrew House of Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lori Beth Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ashley M. Burgemeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald Corwin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keri Ann Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ashley Morgan Burgemeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?