Regalado v. Barr et al
Defendant: Johnny Choate, Chad Wolf, William P. BARR, Matthew T. Albence and ICE Field Office Dir Jeffrey Lynch
Petitioner: Azael Barrientos Regalado
Respondent: Jeffrey Lynch, William Barr and Johnny (I) Choate
Case Number: 1:2019cv03650
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause by Respondents Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Johnny Choate, Jeffrey Lynch, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl. of Christopher Rabe)(Elliott, Jessica)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Court DENIES Petitioner's motion for injunctive relief (ECF No. #10 ) and instead ORDERS Respondents to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen days why Plaintiff's habeas petition should not be granted. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 01/10/2020. (rvill, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica E. Elliott on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Johnny Choate, Jeffrey Lynch, Chad WolfAttorney Jessica E. Elliott added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:res), Attorney Jessica E. Elliott added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Jessica E. Elliott added to party Johnny Choate(pty:res), Attorney Jessica E. Elliott added to party Jeffrey Lynch(pty:res), Attorney Jessica E. Elliott added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res) (Elliott, Jessica)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction, and Order to Show Cause. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03650-RM. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER re: #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction, and Order to Show Cause filed by Azael Barrientos Regalado, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/7/2020. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction, and Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Azael Barrientos Regalado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wadhwa, Jennifer)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kevin McAleenan and Civil Process Clerk by Petitioner Azael Barrientos Regalado. (Wadhwa, Jennifer)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to William Barr, Matthew Albence, Chad Wolf, Jeffrey Lynch, Johnny Choate by Petitioner Azael Barrientos Regalado. (Wadhwa, Jennifer)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/26/2019. Consent Form due by 2/7/2020. (tsher, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (trvo, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Jennifer Ann Wadhwa. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number 1082-7061014)Attorney Jennifer Ann Wadhwa added to party Azael Barrientos Regalado(pty:pet), filed by Azael Barrientos Regalado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wadhwa, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regalado v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Field Office Dir Jeffrey Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Azael Barrientos Regalado
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Wadhwa
Represented By: Aaron C. Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Lynch
Represented By: Jessica E. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Jessica E. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny (I) Choate
Represented By: Jessica E. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?