Roberts v. Montano et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Richard Roberts
Defendant: Montano, Mesa County Sheriff's Dept. and Mesa County Detention Facility
Case Number: 1:2019cv03666
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 20 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This Magistrate Judge respectfully RECOMMENDS that the amended Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #9 ) and the action be dismissed as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 02/12/2020. (rvill, )
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03666-LTB-GPG. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/11/2020. (rvill, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/10/2020. (angar, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (rvill, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Shawn Richard Roberts in the amount of $ 24.00; Receipt Number COX093905 (apesa, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER re: Restraining Order by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (rvill, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER re: "Letter from the courts to Proceed in Forma Pauperis" by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (rvill, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (rvill, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Jeremiah Starr by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (rvill, )
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #10 ) filed January 16, 2020, is DENIED as moot because Plaintiff already has been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in this action. (See ECF No. #4 .) By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 01/17/2020. (rvill, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (rvill, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Deputy Montano and Mesa County Detention Facility, filed by Shawn Richard Roberts.(rvill, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION in Support of Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (rvill, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #6 ) filed January 6, 2020, is DENIED as premature because the instant action is under initial review. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 01/07/2020. (rvill, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Mr. Roberts file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint as directed in this order. If Mr. Roberts fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 01/07/2020. (rvill, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (rvill, )
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #3 ) is granted. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/24/2019. (Copy mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (agarc, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Mesa County Sheriff's Dept., and Deputy Montano, filed by Shawn Richard Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Montano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa County Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Richard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?