Scherrer v. FPT Operating Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Maura Scherrer
Defendant: FPT Operating Company, LLC and FPT Operating Company, LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Talus Payment
Case Number: 1:2019cv03703
Filed: December 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant FPT Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Ballon, Ian)
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Ian C. Ballon. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 DEFENDANT FPT OPERATING COMPANY, LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FPT Operating Company, LLC.(Ballon, Ian)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ian C. Ballon on behalf of FPT Operating Company, LLC (Ballon, Ian)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER ReSetting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Due to a scheduling conflict, IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 3/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 3/4/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3-1) is due 3/4/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/24/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, Defendant FPT Operating Company, LLC's answer or other responsive pleading is due 2/24/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/23/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Troy A. Eid on behalf of FPT Operating Company, LLC Attorney Troy A. Eid added to party FPT Operating Company, LLC (pty:dft) (Eid, Troy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant FPT Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ballon, Ian)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 2/19/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 2/12/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3-1) is due 2/12/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/6/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maura Scherrer. FPT Operating Company, LLC served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Coleman, Stefan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Avi R. Kaufman on behalf of Maura ScherrerAttorney Avi R. Kaufman added to party Maura Scherrer(pty:pla) (Kaufman, Avi)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
December 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
December 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FPT Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Talus Payments (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7067837)Attorney Stefan L. Coleman added to party Maura Scherrer(pty:pla), filed by Maura Scherrer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coleman, Stefan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scherrer v. FPT Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maura Scherrer
Represented By: Stefan L. Coleman
Represented By: Avi R. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPT Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Ian C. Ballon
Represented By: Troy A. Eid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPT Operating Company, LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Talus Payment
Represented By: Ian C. Ballon
Represented By: Troy A. Eid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?