Hong v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Eun Mi Hong
Defendant: Acting Secretary CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Director Kenneth CUCCINELLI, Field Office Dir. MICAH BROWN, Field Office Dir. ANDREW LAMBRECHT, ANGELA Kristi GOLDINGER, Andrew Lambrecht, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, Micah Brown and Angela K. Goldinger
Case Number: 1:2019cv03723
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hana H. Shatila on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Micah Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Angela K. Goldinger(pty:dft), Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:dft) (Shatila, Hana)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Hagerty on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Elizabeth Hagerty added to party Micah Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Hagerty added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Hagerty added to party Angela K. Goldinger(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Hagerty added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Hagerty added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:dft) (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/16/2020. ORDERED that on or before the deadline for defendants' response to the complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(2), the parties shall file (using the Notice event in CM/ECF) a proposed Joint Case Management Plan. (sphil, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Micah Brown served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Angela K. Goldinger served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Andrew Lambrecht served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Bunnell, Jessica)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00; Receipt number COX093428. Text only entry. (agarc, ) Modified on 1/2/2020 to notice a document is not attached (agarc, ).
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICAH BROWN, Kenneth CUCCINELLI, ANGELA Kristi GOLDINGER, ANDREW LAMBRECHT, CHAD F. WOLF (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Jessica D. Bunnell added to party Eun Mi Hong(pty:pla), filed by Eun Mi Hong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Summons Summons Wolf, #7 Summons Summons Cuccinelli, #8 Summons Summons Goldinger, #9 Summons Summons Lambrecht, #10 Summons Summons Brown, #11 Summons Summons Barr, #12 Summons Summons Dunn)(Bunnell, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary CHAD F. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. MICAH BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. ANDREW LAMBRECHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA Kristi GOLDINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Brown
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K. Goldinger
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eun Mi Hong
Represented By: Jessica D. Bunnell
Represented By: David Lawrence Kolko
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?