Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC v. Lever, LLC
Plaintiff: Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC
Defendant: Lever, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00049
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/20/2020. Lever, LLC answer due 3/16/2020. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 4/2/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(tsher, )
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #7 Minute Order and to Continue Scheduling Conference and Associated Dates filed by Lever, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/20/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #7 Minute Order and to Continue Scheduling Conference and Associated Dates by Defendant Lever, LLC. (Juo, James)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/ 19/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/19/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hawranek, Scott)
February 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott J. Hawranek on behalf of Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLCAttorney Scott J. Hawranek added to party Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC(pty:pla) (Hawranek, Scott)
February 19, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Juo, James)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge William J. Martinez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-49-WJM (angar, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-49-NRN (angar, ) Modified on 2/18/2020 wrong judge assignment (angar, ).
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00049-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER re: #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Lever, LLC by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/18/2020. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Lever, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Juo, James)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas P. Howard on behalf of Lever, LLCAttorney Thomas P. Howard added to party Lever, LLC(pty:dft) (Howard, Thomas)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC. Lever, LLC served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Au, Yiu)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dustin Robert DuFault on behalf of Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLCAttorney Dustin Robert DuFault added to party Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC(pty:pla) (DuFault, Dustin)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/8/2020. Consent Form due by 2/21/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2020 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Yiu Fai Au. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Lever, LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC. (Au, Yiu)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lever, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7082006)Attorney Yiu Fai Au added to party Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Au, Yiu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC v. Lever, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lightspeed Running & Rehabilitation System, LLC
Represented By: Yiu Fai Au
Represented By: Dustin Robert DuFault
Represented By: Scott J. Hawranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lever, LLC
Represented By: James Juo
Represented By: Thomas P. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?