GrowlerU Franco, LLC et al v. Srivastava et al
Plaintiff: GrowlerU Franco, LLC and GrowlerU Franco, LLC a Colorado Limited Liability Company doing business as Growler USA
Defendant: Sun Valley Commons Pad 19, LLC, Someshwar LLC, dba Lounge 74, Pranay Prakash Srivastava, Sawankumar Patel, Someshwar LLC and Someshwar LLC a North Carolina Limited Liability Company doing business as Lounge 74
Case Number: 1:2020cv00051
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GrowlerU Franco, LLC. Someshwar LLC served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Vellone, Patrick)
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GrowlerU Franco, LLC. Pranay Prakash Srivastava served on 2/5/2020. (Vellone, Patrick)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GrowlerU Franco, LLC. Sun Valley Commons Pad 19, LLC served on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Vellone, Patrick)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sawankumar Patel, Someshwar LLC, Pranay Prakash Srivastava, Sun Valley Commons Pad 19, LLC Attorney Patrick D. Vellone added to party GrowlerU Franco, LLC(pty:pla), filed by GrowlerU Franco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vellone, Patrick)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/28/20 GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Sun Valley Commons Pad 19, LLC answer due 3/12/2020.(nmarb, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Sun Valley Commons Pad 19, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Nesbitt, Nathaniel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1, 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) by Defendants Sawankumar Patel, Someshwar LLC, Pranay Prakash Srivastava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Grant, Paul)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Matthew Grant on behalf of Sawankumar Patel, Someshwar LLC, Pranay Prakash SrivastavaAttorney Paul Matthew Grant added to party Sawankumar Patel(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Matthew Grant added to party Someshwar LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Matthew Grant added to party Pranay Prakash Srivastava(pty:dft) (Grant, Paul)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/12/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/19/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sun Valley Commons Pad 19, LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff GrowlerU Franco, LLC. (Jonsen, Jeremy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Someshwar LLC dba Lounge 74 re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff GrowlerU Franco, LLC. (Jonsen, Jeremy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sawankumar Patel re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff GrowlerU Franco, LLC. (Jonsen, Jeremy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Pranay Prakash Srivastava re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff GrowlerU Franco, LLC. (Jonsen, Jeremy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 01/08/2020. Case returned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated at 20-cv-00051-KLM. (rvill, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sawankumar Patel, Someshwar LLC, dba Lounge 74, Pranay Prakash Srivastava, Sun Valley Commons Pad 19, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7082326)Attorney Jeremy Thayer Jonsen added to party GrowlerU Franco, LLC(pty:dft), filed by GrowlerU Franco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Jonsen, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GrowlerU Franco, LLC et al v. Srivastava et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GrowlerU Franco, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Thayer Jonsen
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GrowlerU Franco, LLC a Colorado Limited Liability Company doing business as Growler USA
Represented By: Jeremy Thayer Jonsen
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Valley Commons Pad 19, LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Hiller Nesbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Someshwar LLC, dba Lounge 74
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pranay Prakash Srivastava
Represented By: Paul Matthew Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawankumar Patel
Represented By: Paul Matthew Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Someshwar LLC
Represented By: Paul Matthew Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Someshwar LLC a North Carolina Limited Liability Company doing business as Lounge 74
Represented By: Paul Matthew Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?