Denver Health and Hospital Authority v. Azar II et al
Plaintiff: Denver Health and Hospital Authority
Defendant: The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Alex M. Azar II and Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv00054
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of Alex M. Azar II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, TheAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party Alex M. Azar II(pty:dft), Attorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, The(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/24/2020. (athom, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Lewis T. Babcock. Case returned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00054-REB. (rvill, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX093501. (alave, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Tami Sue Smason added to party Denver Health and Hospital Authority(pty:pla), filed by Denver Health and Hospital Authority. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smason, Tami)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denver Health and Hospital Authority v. Azar II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Health and Hospital Authority
Represented By: Tami Sue Smason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, The
Represented By: Logan Ann Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?