Taylor v. Kefalas et al
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Taylor
Defendant: Irene Josey, Jeannine Haag, William Nelson, Steve Johnson, Deborah Morgan, Armor Correctional Health Services, Justin Smith, Tom Donnelly, Larimer County Jail and John Kefalas
Case Number: 1:2020cv00068
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The Motion for Leave to Exceed 30 Page Limit of Prisoner Complaint Form Revised December 2017 (ECF No. #11 ) is denied, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/5/2020.(angar, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION for Leave to Exceed 30 Page Limit filed by Defendants Tom Donnelly, Jeannine Haag, Steve Johnson, Irene Josey, John Kefalas, Larimer County Jail, Deborah Morgan, William Nelson, Justin Smith. (Lowe, Michael)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Exceed 30 Page Limit of Prisoner Complaint form Revised December 2017, by Plaintiff Clifford J. Taylor. (angar, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance as Co-Counsel by David Patrick Ayraud on behalf of Tom Donnelly, Jeannine Haag, Steve Johnson, Irene Josey, John Kefalas, Larimer County Jail, Deborah Morgan, William Nelson, Justin SmithAttorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party Tom Donnelly(pty:dft), Attorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party Jeannine Haag(pty:dft), Attorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party Steve Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party Irene Josey(pty:dft), Attorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party John Kefalas(pty:dft), Attorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party Larimer County Jail(pty:dft), Attorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party Deborah Morgan(pty:dft), Attorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party William Nelson(pty:dft), Attorney David Patrick Ayraud added to party Justin Smith(pty:dft) (Ayraud, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Turner Lowe on behalf of Tom Donnelly, Jeannine Haag, Steve Johnson, Irene Josey, John Kefalas, Larimer County Jail, Deborah Morgan, William Nelson, Justin SmithAttorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Tom Donnelly(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Jeannine Haag(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Steve Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Irene Josey(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party John Kefalas(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Larimer County Jail(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Deborah Morgan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party William Nelson(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Turner Lowe added to party Justin Smith(pty:dft) (Lowe, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to File Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended prisoner complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/13/2020. (angar, )
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Leave to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/11/2020.(angar, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Clifford J. Taylor. (angar, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against Armor Correctional Health Services, Tom Donnelly, Jeannine Haag, Steve Johnson, Irene Josey, John Kefalas, Larimer County Jail, Deborah Morgan, William Nelson, Justin Smith, filed by Clifford J. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(angar, )
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain and utilize the court-approvedPrisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Prisoner Complaint forms (with the assistance of his case manager or the facilitys legal assistant), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not revise the courts approved forms. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave toProceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is denied without prejudice torefiling such a request on the court-approved form. Plaintiff fails to cure all designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/9/2020.(apesa, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Clifford J. Taylor. (cmadr, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 ADA Discrimination, Medical Negligence and Civil Rights Conspiracy Verified Prima Facie COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demand against Armor Correctional Health Services, Tom Donnelly, Jeannine Haag, Steve Johnson, Irene Josey, John Kefalas, Larimer County Jail, Deborah Morgan, William Nelson, Justin Smith, filed by Clifford J. Taylor.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Kefalas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Josey
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannine Haag
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Nelson
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Johnson
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Morgan
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Smith
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Donnelly
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer County Jail
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kefalas
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: David Patrick Ayraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?